Barbee v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Barbee
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and Cornelius Newsom
Case Number: 6:2019cv03370
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (McIlvain, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Brittany Barbee (Henry, H.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of settlement by Brittany Barbee (Henry, H.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. filed a motion to dismiss on October 23, 2019. Plaintiff's response was due on November 6, 2019, but no response was filed. Plaintiff is now ordered to show cause why Defendant UPS's motion to dismiss should not be granted. Show cause response due by 11/26/2019. Signed on 11/12/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (El-Zein, Anna)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to dismiss party United Parcel Service, Inc. filed by Todd C. Stanton on behalf of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Missouri Crash Report)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Stanton, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss party United Parcel Service, Inc. filed by Todd C. Stanton on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stanton, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Stanton, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Trial on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc..(Stanton, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cornelius Newsom. (Stanton, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Trial on behalf of Cornelius Newsom. Stanton, Todd) Modified on 10/23/2019 correcting docket text (Siegert, Karen).
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/6/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/22/2019. Signed on 10/21/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL by Cornelius Newsom, United Parcel Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Stanton, Todd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS CERTIFICATE OF DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. filed by Todd C. Stanton on behalf of Defendants Cornelius Newsom, United Parcel Service, Inc..(Stanton, Todd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Todd C. Stanton on behalf of All Defendants (Stanton, Todd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oregon County Circuit Court County, case number 19AM-CC00010, filed by Todd C. Stanton on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6544643. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex.A State Court File, #3 Exhibit Ex. B Police Report, #4 Exhibit Ex.C Sec. of State Registration, #5 Exhibit Original Filing Form)(Stanton, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Todd C. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius Newsom
Represented By: Todd C. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Barbee
Represented By: H. Lynn Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?