Mountain Grove School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mountain Grove School District
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv03422
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-CTO-17, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of California to be included in MDL No. 2913. Signed on 12/23/2019. Case electronically transferred. (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mountain Grove School District. Juul Labs, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Cartmell, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 2913 with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Siegert, Karen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
December 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juul Labs, Inc. (Siegert, Karen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inc. filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Mountain Grove School District. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6623201. Service due by 3/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2019 with a non-editable pdf document) (Siegert, Karen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Grove School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Grove School District
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?