Warner v. The Bank of Missouri
Plaintiff: Mary K Warner
Defendant: The Bank of Missouri
Case Number: 6:2019cv03424
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 4, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Bank of Missouri filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 4, 2020 Filing 30 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Kevin Fitzgerald(Groves, Greggory)
February 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 2/3/20 as Document No. 27, Designation of Mediator. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document (Designation). Counsel will refile the document using the correct event under Civil Events - Other Filings - ADR Documents - Designation of Mediator. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas)
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Plaintiff Mary K Warner.(Groves, Greggory)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR CERTIFICATE by Mary K Warner. (Groves, Greggory)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 joint motion to modify scheduling and trial order. The Court modifies the scheduling order as follows: Daubert motions shall be filed on or before September 28, 2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 12, 2020. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/3/2020 Time in court: 10:00 a.m. to 10:05 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
January 29, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Related document(s) #13 ) (McCarthy, Thomas)
January 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference regarding Motion to Modify Scheduling and Trial Order [Doc. 22] set for 2/3/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all parties are on the line, call Chambers at 417-865-3741.(Howard, Linda)
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to amend/correct #17 Scheduling Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (McCarthy, Thomas)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #2 motion to dismiss case and #9 motion for leave to file. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint (Doc. 8), and a response to the pending motion to dismiss the amended complaint, rendering these motions moot. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to answer and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Plaintiff Mary K Warner. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Groves, Greggory)
January 23, 2020 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Plaintiff Mary K Warner. Reply suggestions due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Groves, Greggory)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 1/22/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for four days beginning 2/9/2021 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2021 08:30 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 3/16/2020., Discovery Motions due by 8/28/2020., Status Reports due by 3/23/2020; 5/21/2020 and 7/20/2020.) Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Signed on 1/22/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 20, 2020 Filing 16 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by The Bank of Missouri. (McCarthy, Thomas)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint on behalf of The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Related document(s) #13 ) (McCarthy, Thomas)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McCarthy, Thomas)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/20/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 2/5/2020. Signed on 1/6/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note new case number 19-3424-CV-S-MDH. (Richard, Tracey)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary K Warner. (Groves, Greggory)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to file Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Answer and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Mary K Warner. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Groves, Greggory)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF COURSE against The Bank of Missouri filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Mary K Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Groves, Greggory)
December 25, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/3/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/20/2020. Signed on 12/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of The Bank of Missouri.(McCarthy, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUGGESTIONS in support re #2 MOTION to dismiss case (partial) filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of Defendant The Bank of Missouri. (Related document(s) #2 ) (McCarthy, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to dismiss case (partial) filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McCarthy, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Green County, MO County, case number 1931-CC01376, filed by Thomas Owen McCarthy on behalf of The Bank of Missouri. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6624313. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarthy, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. The Bank of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K Warner
Represented By: Greggory D Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Missouri
Represented By: Thomas Owen McCarthy
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?