Heidrich et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Zoe Heidrich and Steven Heidrich
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2020cv00248
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER granting #20 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. The matter is stayed for 90 days. Signed on April 16, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to stay filed by Ryan E. Hodge on behalf of Steven Heidrich. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hodge, Ryan)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6816190) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Pamela J. Marple for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER granting #13 MOTION to withdraw as attorney Richard B. North, Jr filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney, Richard B. North, Jr, for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated is hereby terminated. Signed on April 3, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Chorny, Traci)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to allow Pamela J. Marple to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6808013) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to withdraw as attorney *Richard B. North Jr.* filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara) Modified on 4/3/2020 to clarify docket text. The NEF will not be regenerated. (Chorny, Traci).
April 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/2/2020 as Document No. 12, Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Attorney. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing withdrawal of attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Stubbs, Kara)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Case was erroneously opened in the Western Division. Case is transferred to the Southern Division and is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:20-00248-CV-S-LMC. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02648.
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Moore, Terri)
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) filed by Steven Heidrich. All pleadings are to be filed in the Lead MDL Case: MDL-15-2641. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Ryan E Hodge. (Hodge, Ryan) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02648-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16832352 filed by Steven Heidrich, Zoe Heidrich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heidrich et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Heidrich
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan E. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Heidrich
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan E. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?