Cabool, Missouri, City of v. Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cabool, Missouri, City of
Defendant: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv03003
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Robert Joseph Schaeffer, III on behalf of Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. (Attorney Robert Joseph Schaeffer, III added to party Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schaeffer, Robert)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Bryan O. Wade on behalf of Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. (Attorney Bryan O. Wade added to party Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wade, Bryan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Cabool, Missouri, City of. Waiver sent to Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Schraeder, Ivan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. on January 8, 2020 by Cabool, Missouri, City of. Waiver of Service due by 2/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schraeder, Ivan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. filed by Ivan L. Schraeder on behalf of Cabool, Missouri, City of. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6650246. Service due by 4/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cabool Wastewater Treatment Facility Operating Permit, #2 Exhibit B - Dairy Farmers of America MoDNR Operating Permit, #3 Exhibit C - City Notice of Intent to Sue/60 Day Letter to DFA, #4 Exhibit D - MoDNR Unsatisfactory Findings Report to DFA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schraeder, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabool, Missouri, City of v. Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Schaeffer, III
Represented By: Bryan O. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabool, Missouri, City of
Represented By: Ivan L. Schraeder
Represented By: Thomas E Loraine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?