Price v. Mercy Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Susan E Price
Defendant: Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie, Liz Berman and Daren Honeycutt
Case Number: 6:2020cv03137
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to remand to State Court and Response/Objections to Defendants Notice of Removal Supplemental Suggestions filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Susan E Price. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Kirksey, Jerry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Susan E Price. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A thru C)(Kirksey, Jerry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan E Price Plaintiff's Third Set of Request for Production to Defendant Mercy Health System filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Susan E Price.(Kirksey, Jerry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Withdrawal of Deposition Notice by Susan E Price (Kirksey, Jerry)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mercy Hospital Defendant Mercy's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Mercy Hospital.(Fowler, Tina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Note the new case number: 6:20-03137-CV-S-BP. (Martin, Jan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Ann Young filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Susan E Price.(Kirksey, Jerry)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mercy Hospital Mercys Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Set Second of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Mercy Hospital.(Fowler, Tina)
June 2, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 6/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Martin, Jan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mercy Hospital Certificate of Service Defendant Mercy Health System's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Request for Production of Documents filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Mercy Hospital.(Fowler, Tina)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand to State Court and Response/Objections to Defendants Notice of Removal filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendants Liz Berman, Daren Honeycutt, Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie. Reply suggestions due by 6/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Fowler, Tina)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to remand to State Court and Response/Objections to Defendants Notice of Removal filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Susan E Price. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kirksey, Jerry)
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/12/2020 as Document No. 5, Plaintiff's Answer to Complaint. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Liz Berman, Daren Honeycutt, Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie re 5 Answer to Complaint (Fowler, Tina)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine A. Thompson on behalf of Liz Berman, Daren Honeycutt, Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie (Attorney Katherine A. Thompson added to party Liz Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A. Thompson added to party Daren Honeycutt(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A. Thompson added to party Mercy Hospital(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A. Thompson added to party Kimberly Peterie(pty:dft))(Thompson, Katherine)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Rachel A Riso on behalf of Liz Berman, Daren Honeycutt, Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie (Attorney Rachel A Riso added to party Liz Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel A Riso added to party Daren Honeycutt(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel A Riso added to party Mercy Hospital(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel A Riso added to party Kimberly Peterie(pty:dft))(Riso, Rachel)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/6/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/22/2020. Signed on 5/13/2020 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Complaint Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand to State Court on behalf of Susan E Price.(Kirksey, Jerry)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS OF MERCY HOSPITAL filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Mercy Hospital.(Fowler, Tina)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal by Liz Berman, Daren Honeycutt, Mercy Hospital, Kimberly Peterie re #1 Notice of Removal, (Fowler, Tina)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri County, case number 1731-CC00208, All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6849975. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3)(Fowler, Tina)
May 7, 2020 Notice of Magistrate Assignment: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 5/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Mercy Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Rachel A Riso
Represented By: Katherine A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Peterie
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Rachel A Riso
Represented By: Katherine A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Berman
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Rachel A Riso
Represented By: Katherine A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Honeycutt
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Rachel A Riso
Represented By: Katherine A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Price
Represented By: Jerry M. Kirksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?