Fittro v. Arnott et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Todd Fittro
Defendant: Dr. Jason Wilkens, Sheriff Brad Cole, Sheriff Jim C. Arnott and Clerk Barbara Stillings
Case Number: 6:2020cv03164
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE of filing by Wesley Todd Fittro (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Envelope)(Furtak, Rebecca) NEF mailed to Wesley Todd Fittro at address on file.
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION to compel, #2 MOTION for order on behalf of Plaintiff Wesley Todd Fittro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(Related document(s) #4 , #2 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff, Wesley Todd Fittro, 34 Lago Vista Place, Palm Coast, FL 32164. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to compel filed by Wesley Todd Fittro. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)NEF mailed to Plaintiff, 34 Lago Vista Place, Palm Coast, FL 32164. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. District Judge Roseann Ketchmark no longer assigned to case. Signed on June 3, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for order MOTION TO PULL CASES FROM STATE filed by Wesley Todd Fittro. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wesley Todd Fittro. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status, #2 Complaint, #3 Attachment as to Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16) #20 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fittro v. Arnott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jason Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Brad Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jim C. Arnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk Barbara Stillings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Todd Fittro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?