Reeves v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: John Reeves
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv03259
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Darren McDowell and Eric Martin Przybysz terminated. Signed on 10/05/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
September 25, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Eric Przybysz and Darren McDowell filed by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of John Reeves. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER sustaining #39 motion to stay. Case is stayed until 02/23/2021 in light of pre-transfer settlement discussions. Signed on 09/21/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Maerz, Mary)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #34 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Jordan E Jarreau terminated. Signed on 09/21/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary) (Main Document 43 replaced on 10/5/2020) (Maerz, Mary).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #33 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Jessica Junek terminated. Signed on 09/21/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary) (Main Document 42 replaced on 10/5/2020) (Maerz, Mary).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #32 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews terminated. Signed on 09/21/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary) (Main Document 41 replaced on 10/5/2020) (Maerz, Mary).
September 11, 2020 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc.(Stubbs, Kara)
September 9, 2020 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 9, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven Scott Schulte for John Reeves allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 Motion to allow Steven S. Schulte to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7034235) filed by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of John Reeves. (Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of appearance by Chelsea E Dickerson on behalf of John Reeves (Attorney Chelsea E Dickerson added to party John Reeves(pty:pla))(Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Jordan E. Jarreau filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Jessica Junek filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Melissa Dorman Matthews filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John Voorhees for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, and McKesson Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/13/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/25/2020. Signed on 8/27/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 Motion to allow John Voorhees to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7016457) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Stubbs, Kara)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, and McKesson Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7016380) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Stubbs, Kara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02349.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Patricia Britt's case be severed and transferred to the Sioux City Division of the Northern District of Iowa (Civil case 3:20-cv-2342-S opened); b. Plaintiff Jessica Burge's case be severed and transferred to the Hattiesburg Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2343-S opened); c. Plaintiff Lori Finn's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2344-S opened); d. Plaintiff Joseph Ingram's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2345-S opened); e. Plaintiff James Jones's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2346-S opened); f. Plaintiff Barbara Lawrence's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2347-S opened); g. Plaintiff John Reeves's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2349-S opened); h. Plaintiff Venette Terry's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2350-S opened); i. Plaintiff Quinten Wedge's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2362-S opened). Plaintiff Catherine Simpson is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Resp/Reply filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten image on 6/17/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/12/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10905573) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Citation Issued McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Affidavit of Service McKinnson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service - C. R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reeves
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Chelsea E Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?