Lewis v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lewis
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT&T
Case Number: 6:2020cv03373
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Lewis filed by Kristen Michael O'Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Lewis.(O'Neal, Kristen)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 2/9/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 10:30 AM Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 2/9/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/9/2021. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Kristen O'Neal. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Daniel Boatright. Time in court: 9:30 a.m. to 9:45 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 1/27/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boatright, Daniel)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kristen Michael O'Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Lewis.(O'Neal, Kristen)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/25/2021 as Document No. 22, Notice of Filing. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel has been notified and will refile the document using the correct event under Discovery Documents. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey Lewis (O'Neal, Kristen)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed on 1/22/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rodney E. Loomer(Boatright, Daniel)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Boatright, Daniel)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company for First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I and VI through XII of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I and VI through XII of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Michael O'Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Lewis. Reply suggestions due by 1/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (O'Neal, Kristen)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I and VI through XII of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts I and VI through XII of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boatright, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/29/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Stephen R. Bough, conference call-in numbers will be provided to counsel via email the week prior to the scheduling conference. Signed on 12/16/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV, and VII Through XIII of Plaintiff's Petition. (Doc. #4). Given the filing of an Amended Complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), the pending motion is denied without prejudice as moot. Signed on 12/15/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Lewis re #8 Amended Complaint ECF No. 8 filed by Kristen Michael O'Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey Lewis. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Lewis.(O'Neal, Kristen)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Jeffrey Lewis, Plaintiff against Southwestern Bell Telephone Company filed by Kristen Michael O'Neal on behalf of Jeffrey Lewis.(O'Neal, Kristen)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Please note the new case number: 20-3373-CV-S-SRB. (Melvin, Greg)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boatright, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Boatright, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, case number 2031-CC01203, filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7160729. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Boatright, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT&T
Represented By: Sara Katherine McCallum
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Deborah A. Malkmus
Represented By: Kristen Michael O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?