Jenkins v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tonya Jenkins
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 6:2021cv03003
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 2/5/2021 Social security answer due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 5/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: Atty Gen 2/9/21; US Atty 2/5/21; ORC 2/5/21)(Overton, Kathleen)
February 1, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Tonya Jenkins. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BMOWDC-7219297) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Tonya Jenkins. Service due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Tonya Jenkins(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Jenkins
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?