HopLoads, LLC v. Bulk Loads Now, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HopLoads, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-15, Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn and Donna Stearns
Case Number: 6:2021cv03019
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 68 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Brenda Green filed by Jason C. Smith on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Smith, Jason)
December 21, 2021 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Supplemental Discovery Responses filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC.(Moore, Adam)
December 20, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of filing - Declaration of Jessica Hill in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees by Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn re #65 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, Order on Motion to Compel,, (Hill, Jessica)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - GRANTING #50 defendant's motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions against Plaintiff Hoploads, LLC. Within 14 days of entry of this Order, defendants are to submit to the Court a declaration of fees associated with the efforts to obtain discovery beginning after September 8, 2021. Plaintiff is to comply with all outstanding discovery requests within 14 days of entry of this Order. DENYING AS MOOT #48 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed on 12/6/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Defendants' motion for extension of time. Defendants are to designate experts on or before March 3, 2022. Signed on 12/3/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
November 29, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HopLoads, LLC filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC.(Moore, Adam)
November 29, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION for extension of time to Designate Experts and for Expedited Briefing filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hill, Jessica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 61 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Donna Stearns filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 60 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Brenda Green filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 59 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Dave Ross filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 58 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #50 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions) filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. (Related document(s) #50 ) (Hill, Jessica)
November 12, 2021 Filing 57 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Dave Ross filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 12, 2021 Filing 56 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Donna Stearns filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 12, 2021 Filing 55 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Brenda Green filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
November 10, 2021 Filing 54 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #50 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions) filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 11/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #50 ) (Moore, Adam)
November 8, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE to take deposition of Brenda Green filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
October 28, 2021 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bulk Loads Now, LLC for Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Third Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC and Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Third Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimant Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Defendant Bulk Loads Now, LLC.(Hill, Jessica)
October 27, 2021 Filing 51 SUGGESTIONS in support re #50 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions) filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. (Related document(s) #50 ) (Hill, Jessica)
October 27, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions) filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Hill, Jessica)
October 19, 2021 Filing 49 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #48 MOTION for extension of time filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Reply suggestions due by 11/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Hill, Jessica)
October 15, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for extension of time filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Moore, Adam)
September 15, 2021 Filing 47 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: DISCOVERY TELECONFERENCE held on 9/15/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Adam Moore. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jessica Hill. Time in court: 11:36 a.m. to 12:02 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (to correct clerical error)- This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Teleconference set for 9/15/2021 11:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. A separate email has been sent to counsel containing the teleconference participation information.(Anderson, Christy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Teleconference set for 11/15/2021 11:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. A separate email has been sent to counsel containing the teleconference participation information.(Anderson, Christy)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting #43 parties joint motion for protective order. Signed on 9/1/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Attachments: #1 A - Acknowledgment) (Anderson, Christy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of HopLoads, LLC, Donna Stearns. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Moore, Adam)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Pursuant to the teleconference held on August 25, 2021, parties are to file a joint motion for protective order on or before 9/1/2021. Signed on 8/31/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 41 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: DISCOVERY TELECONFERENCE held on 8/25/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Adam Moore. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jason Smith, Jessica Hill. Time in court: 10:33 a.m. to 11:19 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 40 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Paul Kailas filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
August 20, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Teleconference set for 8/25/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. A separate email has been sent to counsel containing the teleconference participation information.(Anderson, Christy)
August 18, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE to take deposition of Paul Kailas filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
August 12, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE to take deposition of Donna Stearns filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica) (Main Document 37 replaced on 8/12/2021 to remove Exhibit A per attorney request. NEF regenerated.) (Warren, Melissa)
August 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE to take deposition of Dave Ross filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica) (Main Document 36 replaced on 8/12/2021 to remove Exhibit A per attorney request. NEF regenerated.) (Warren, Melissa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn for Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Second Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC and Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Second Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
April 23, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Donna Stearns.(Moore, Adam)
April 21, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn re #31 Certificate of Service, for Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC and Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Amended First Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Hoploads, LLC filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Related document: #31 Certificate of Service, filed by Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC, Counter Defendant Donna Stearns.(Attorney Adam R. Moore added to party Donna Stearns(pty:cd))(Moore, Adam)
April 16, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant HopLoads, LLC and Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Counter Claimants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn, Defendants Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn.(Hill, Jessica)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 2/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2022. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 4/14/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 8/18/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 09:00 AM (for 8 days) in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes.
April 14, 2021 Filing 29 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 4/14/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Adam Moore. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jessica Hill. Time in court: 10:09 a.m. to 10:16 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
April 14, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Moore, Adam)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting motion to withdraw as attorney. (Doc. 20). Attorney Jennifer L. Sturm is terminated. Signed on April 7, 2021, by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting motion to withdraw as attorney. (Doc. 19). Attorney Ryann A Glenn is terminated. Signed on April 7, 2021, by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting motion to withdraw as attorney. (Doc. 18). Attorney Ginger K. Gooch is terminated. Signed on April 7, 2021, by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 7, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn (Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc), Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Jared Flinn(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc))(Hill, Jessica)
March 31, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Moore, Adam)
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by HopLoads, LLC. (Moore, Adam)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/22/2021 as Document No. 21, Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. Additionally, per Administrative Procedures, any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. Counsel has been contacted. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by HopLoads, LLC. (Moore, Adam)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Jennifer Sturm, I on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jennifer Sturm, I added to party Jared Flinn(pty:dft))(Sturm, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Ryann A Glenn on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Glenn, Ryann)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gooch, Ginger)
March 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Derek Adam Ankrom on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn (Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Jared Flinn(pty:dft), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc))(Ankrom, Derek)
March 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Jason C. Smith on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn (Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Bulk Loads Now, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc), Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Jared Flinn(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party Jared Flinn(pty:cc))(Smith, Jason)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of HopLoads, LLC.(Moore, Adam)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Bulk Loads Now, LLC. Waiver sent to HopLoads, LLC on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Glenn, Ryann)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Adam R. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC.(Moore, Adam)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jennifer Sturm for Bulk Loads Now, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Jennifer L. Sturm to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7314448) filed by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC. (Gooch, Ginger)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order remains due by 3/22/2021. Rule 26 conference remains due by 3/8/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 4/14/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/19/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 21-3019-CV-S-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
February 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donna Stearns, and emailed to counsel for service. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against HopLoads, LLC, Donna Stearns filed by Ryann A Glenn on behalf of Plaintiff HopLoads, LLC, Counter Defendant HopLoads, LLC, Defendant Donna Stearns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Glenn, Ryann)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against HopLoads, LLC on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Supporting Declaration)(Glenn, Ryann)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Defendant Bulk Loads Now, LLC.(Gooch, Ginger)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ryann A Glenn for Bulk Loads Now, LLC and Jared Flinn allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to allow Ryann A. Glenn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7264460) filed by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC. (Gooch, Ginger)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 3/22/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/8/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on January 27, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendants: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Christian County, Missouri County, case number 20CT-CC00196, filed by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Bulk Loads Now, LLC, Jared Flinn. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7253586. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Gooch, Ginger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HopLoads, LLC v. Bulk Loads Now, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulk Loads Now, LLC
Represented By: Ginger K. Gooch
Represented By: Ryann A Glenn
Represented By: Derek Adam Ankrom
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Represented By: Jessica R Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Sturm, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Flinn
Represented By: Ginger K. Gooch
Represented By: Ryann A Glenn
Represented By: Derek Adam Ankrom
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Represented By: Jessica R Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Sturm, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HopLoads, LLC
Represented By: Adam R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?