Christopherson et al v. State Farm Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopherson and Derek Christopherson
Defendant: NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., State Farm Bank, FSB, NewRez, LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and New Penn Financial
Case Number: 6:2021cv03071
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by C. Charles Townsend on behalf of Defendants J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Townsend, C.)
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of State Farm Bank, FSB.(Attorney Monte P. Clithero added to party State Farm Bank, FSB(pty:dft))(Clithero, Monte)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion for extension of time (Doc. #13 ): (1) granting extension with modification applying dates certain: proposed scheduling order and Rule 26 disclosures due on or before 6/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the Court; (2) denying without prejudice motion as to extension of Mediation and Assessment Program (MAP) deadlines: the request should be presented to the MAP office per Doc. 4-1. Signed on 5/6/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 motion to reassign/transfer case. Signed on 5/6/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time Reply suggestions due on or before 5/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 5/6/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
May 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to File Reply Supporting Dismissal Motion filed by C. Charles Townsend on behalf of J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Townsend, C.)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case. Signed on 5/4/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson. State Farm Bank, FSB served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Green, Glenn)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for extension of time on deadlines filed by Kory D. Stubblefield on behalf of Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubblefield, Kory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kory D. Stubblefield on behalf of Plaintiffs Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson. Reply suggestions due by 5/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Stubblefield, Kory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to reassign/transfer case to The Honorable Roseann Ketchmark and Suggestions in Support filed by C. Charles Townsend on behalf of J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Townsend, C.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE by publication filed by Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson., SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Bank, FSB. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of timeSuggestions in opposition/response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5) due by 4/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.. Signed on 4/7/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for extension of time to respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Kory D. Stubblefield on behalf of Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubblefield, Kory)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney C. Charles Townsend for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. and NewRez, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow C. Charles Townsend to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7358571) filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC. (Haddad, Mark)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Haddad, Mark)
March 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/4/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 4/19/2021. Signed on 3/18/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Defendants J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.(Haddad, Mark)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ozark County, Missouri County, case number 21OZ-CC00026, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7336348. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopherson et al v. State Farm Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Represented By: Glenn P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Represented By: Glenn P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank, FSB
Represented By: Monte P. Clithero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?