Leitner v. Morsovillo et al
Plaintiff: Rebekah Leitner
Defendant: JumpSix Marketing, LLC, BigPxl, LLC, Jennifer Griffin, Jeffrey Sneed, Richard Morsovillo and David Roark
Case Number: 6:2021cv03075
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2510
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2021 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Conference call-in numbers will be provided to counsel via email the week prior to the scheduling conference. Signed on 5/17/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 Before the Court is Defendants Richard Morosovillo, Jeffrey Sneed, JumpSix Marketing LLC, and BigPxl LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #9), as well as Defendants David Roark and Jennifer Griffin's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #11). Given the filing of an amended complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), the pending motions are denied without prejudice as moot. Signed on 5/17/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BigPxl, LLC, Jennifer Griffin, JumpSix Marketing, LLC, Richard Morsovillo, David Roark, Jeffrey Sneed filed by Brian R Shank on behalf of Rebekah Leitner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Shank, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction over the Persons, and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of Defendants Jennifer Griffin, David Roark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Roark, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jennifer Griffin)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Nelson, Dan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction over the Persons, and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of Jennifer Griffin, David Roark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nelson, Dan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of Defendants BigPxl, LLC, JumpSix Marketing, LLC, Richard Morsovillo, Jeffrey Sneed. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Nelson, Dan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of BigPxl, LLC, JumpSix Marketing, LLC, Richard Morsovillo, Jeffrey Sneed. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nelson, Dan)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Bruce McCurry on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party BigPxl, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party Jennifer Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party JumpSix Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party Richard Morsovillo(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party David Roark(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce McCurry added to party Jeffrey Sneed(pty:dft))(McCurry, Bruce)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Before the Court is Defendants Richard Morosovillo, Jeffrey Sneed, BigPxl, LLC, JumpSix Marketing, LLC, David Roark, and Jennifer Griffin's (Defendants) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response to Complaint for Legal and Equitable Relief. (Doc. #4). For good cause stated, the motion is granted. Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time until and including May 4, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed on 4/19/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant JumpSix Marketing, LLC filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of Defendant JumpSix Marketing, LLC.(Nelson, Dan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant BigPxl, LLC filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of Defendant BigPxl, LLC.(Nelson, Dan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Dan R. Nelson on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party BigPxl, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party Jennifer Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party JumpSix Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party Richard Morsovillo(pty:dft), Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party David Roark(pty:dft), Attorney Dan R. Nelson added to party Jeffrey Sneed(pty:dft))(Nelson, Dan)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Brian R Shank on behalf of Rebekah Leitner (Shank, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebekah Leitner Rebekah Leitner. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7339688. Service due by 6/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shank, Brian)
March 19, 2021 SUMMONSES (6) ISSUED as to BigPxl, LLC, Jennifer Griffin, JumpSix Marketing, LLC, Richard Morsovillo, David Roark, Jeffrey Sneed. (Siegert, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitner v. Morsovillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JumpSix Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BigPxl, LLC
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Griffin
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Sneed
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morsovillo
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Roark
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Dan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Leitner
Represented By: Brian R Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?