Porterfield et al v. Danby Products Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra Porterfield and Andrew Porterfield
Defendant: Danby Products Inc., Kaiping New Widetech Electric Co, Ltd., Danby Products Limited, Love Star Industrial Co., New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd., John Doe Manufacturer, LF, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Essick Air Products, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv03114
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2022. Teleconference set for 1/6/2023 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference via teleconference set for 1/20/2023, 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2023, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 6/28/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Main Document 23 replaced on 6/29/2021 to reflect correct deadline in paragraphs 4 and 5.) (Cordell, Annette).
June 28, 2021 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michael Patton(Reichard, Randall)
June 25, 2021 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michael Patton(Reichard, Randall)
June 24, 2021 Filing 20 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Andrew Porterfield, Cassandra Porterfield. (Reichard, Randall)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to dismiss party Essick Air Products, Inc. Signed on 6/21/2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly)
June 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss party Essick Air Products, Inc. filed by Randall J. Reichard on behalf of Andrew Porterfield, Cassandra Porterfield. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Reichard, Randall)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cassandra Porterfield, Andrew Porterfield. Essick Air Products, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Reichard, Randall)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Danby Products Inc., LF, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd..(McMullen, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of counsel Nicole D. Lindsey by Kory D. Stubblefield on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Kory D. Stubblefield added to party Andrew Porterfield(pty:pla))(Stubblefield, Kory)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Defendant LF, LLC.(McMullen, Michael)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Defendant New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd..(McMullen, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 , #11 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Richard A. Ergo, Gerald C. Kipper allowed to appear pro hac vice for Danby Products Inc., LF, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, and New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. Signed on 5/18/2021 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Gerald C. Kipper to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7418143) filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Danby Products Inc., LF, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd.. (McMullen, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to allow Richard A. Ergo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7418126) filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Danby Products Inc., LF, LLC, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd.. (McMullen, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Dismissal Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Kaiping New Widetech Electric Co., Ltd., Love Star Industrial Co., and Danby Products, Ltd. are DISMISSED without prejudice to the refiling thereof. Signed on 5/17/2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss party Danby Products Limited, Kaiping New Widetech Electric Co., Ltd. and Love Star Industrial Co. filed by Randall J. Reichard on behalf of Andrew Porterfield, Cassandra Porterfield. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Randall J. Reichard added to party Cassandra Porterfield(pty:pla))(Reichard, Randall)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrew Porterfield, Cassandra Porterfield. (Reichard, Randall)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cassandra Porterfield, Andrew Porterfield. New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Reichard, Randall)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/25/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 6/11/2021. Signed on 5/11/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(McMullen, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Defendant Danby Products Inc..(McMullen, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cedar County, case number 20CD-CV00313, filed by Michael C. McMullen. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7406797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMullen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porterfield et al v. Danby Products Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danby Products Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. McMullen
Represented By: Gerald C. Kipper
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiping New Widetech Electric Co, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danby Products Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Star Industrial Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Widetech Industries Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Michael C. McMullen
Represented By: Gerald C. Kipper
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Manufacturer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LF, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. McMullen
Represented By: Gerald C. Kipper
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. McMullen
Represented By: Gerald C. Kipper
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essick Air Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Porterfield
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Represented By: Randall J. Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Porterfield
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Represented By: Randall J. Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?