Butts v. Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Susan C Martel, Judy K Salazar, Sarah E Butts, Lisa Haworth and Sherri Martin
Counter Defendant: Laurel Butts
Counter Claimant: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv03185
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 23 GREEN CARD showing return of service re #22 Order on Motion to Remand. Greene County Circuit Clerk served on 9/13/21/ (Related document(s) #22 ) (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 10, 2021 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri via certified mail 7014 1200 0000 4261 3692. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER:(1) Interpleader Defendants' unopposed motion to remand (Doc. #18 ) this case is GRANTED; (2) this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Greene County, Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c); and (3) the Clerk of Court is directed to disburse the interpleader funds for this case currently deposited in this Court's registry to the Greene County Circuit Clerk, at 1010 N. Boonville Ave, Springfield, MO, 65802, for deposit in the registry of the Greene County Circuit Court pending further order of that court. Signed on 9/9/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Skelton, Sara)
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Sherri Martin.(Attorney Jeffrey Carl Goodnight added to party Sherri Martin(pty:dft))(Goodnight, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: directing the Clerk of Court to accept interpleader funds of $83,783.63 into the court registry, to be deposited into an interest-bearing account pending further order of the Court. Signed on 9/1/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
September 1, 2021 Filing 19 COUNTERCLAIM of Plaintiff Laurel A. Butts against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Genworth Beneficiary Designation)(Glass, Harold)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to remand filed by Craig F. Lowther on behalf of Judy K Salazar. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lowther, Craig)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing as moot Interpleader Defendant's motion to dismiss case (Doc. #12 ) per entry of Order Granting Interpleader, Dismissing Defendant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company with Prejudice, and Naming Proper Party (Doc. #16 ). Signed on 8/24/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING INTERPLEADER. Signed on August 24, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Reply REPLY to answer Genworth's Counterclaim filed by Harold F. Glass on behalf of Plaintiff Laurel Butts. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Glass, Harold)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 Susan C. Martel and Judy K. Salazar's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Genworth Life and Annuity, CROSSCLAIM of Susan C. Martel and Judy Salazar against Laurel Butts, Sarah E Butts on behalf of Judy K Salazar, Susan C Martel.(Attorney Craig F. Lowther added to party Susan C Martel(pty:dft), Attorney Craig F. Lowther added to party Susan C Martel(pty:cd), Attorney Craig F. Lowther added to party Judy K Salazar(pty:cd), Attorney Craig F. Lowther added to party Judy K Salazar(pty:dft))(Lowther, Craig)
August 18, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/17/21 as Document No. 13-1, Proposed Agreed Order Granting Interpleader. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING INTERPLEADER by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING INTERPLEADER)(Whitaker, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Jeffrey Carl Goodnight on behalf of Lisa Haworth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Goodnight, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company on behalf of Lisa Haworth.(Attorney Jeffrey Carl Goodnight added to party Lisa Haworth(pty:dft))(Goodnight, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Kate Millington on behalf of Sarah E Butts (Attorney Kate Millington added to party Sarah E Butts(pty:cd))(Millington, Kate)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Harold F. Glass on behalf of Sarah E Butts (Attorney Harold F. Glass added to party Sarah E Butts(pty:cd))(Glass, Harold)
July 28, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Andrew C Whitaker for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice to Clerk of the Circuit Court and to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cantwell, Emily)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Laurel Butts, Susan C Martel, Judy K Salazar, Sarah E Butts, Lisa Haworth on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company.(Cantwell, Emily)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to allow Andrew C. Whitaker to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7507377) filed by Emily Cantwell on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Cantwell, Emily)
July 23, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah E Butts, Lisa Haworth, Susan C Martel, Judy K Salazar. (Woods, Gloria)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/21/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/4/2021. Signed on July 22, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) Modified on 7/22/2021 to reflect that a copy of the Notice was sent to Plaintiff via regular mail (Wheeler, LaTandra).
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Emily Cantwell on behalf of Defendant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company.(Cantwell, Emily)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, case number 2131-CC00667, filed by Emily Cantwell. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7505708. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantwell, Emily) Modified on 7/22/2021 (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butts v. Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Laurel Butts
Represented By: Harold F. Glass
Represented By: Kate Millington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Shoshanah Mae Shanes
Represented By: Emily Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C Martel
Represented By: Craig F. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy K Salazar
Represented By: Craig F. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah E Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Haworth
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Martin
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?