Parks v. United States Parole Commission
Petitioner: Darrell James Parks
Respondent: United States Parole Commission
Case Number: 6:2021cv03273
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01481.
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by DARRELL JAMES PARKS (ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 6/9/2021. (zjch) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the respondent's #9 Motion to Transfer. See text for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 21, 2021. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION served on 2/25/2021 (eg) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA. USCA Case Number 20-5327. (zrdj) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by DARRELL JAMES PARKS. (Attachment: #1 Attachments)(eg) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/2/2020 (zjch) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is the respondent's #9 Motion to Transfer. It is ORDERED that the petitioner shall file any opposition to the motion on or before December 2, 2020. Should the petitioner fail to file a timely opposition, the Court may treat the motion as conceded or decide it based on the respondent's arguments alone. See Local Civil Rule 7(b). So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 2, 2020. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanore, Sara) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioner has submitted a copy of his Petition for Mandamus #7 to this Court, which has been docketed. Upon review, it appears that the Petition is intended to be filed and seeks relief from the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk for the District Court for the District of Columbia will immediately notify and forward a copy of the Petition to the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit for handling. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 10/27/2020. (psu3) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Guccini Vanore on behalf of UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION (Vanore, Sara) Modified filer on 10/22/2020 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION for Mandamus Relief filed by DARRELL JAMES PARKS.(eg) Modified docket event/text on 10/23/2020 (eg). [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause #4 ; Date of Service of show cause order 10/13/2020. (eg) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
September 11, 2020 SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to #4 Order to Show Cause, sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by DARRELL JAMES PARKS (eg) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the respondent to show cause. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 11, 2020. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that petitioner's application for leave to proceed IFP #2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/5/2020. (dm) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DARRELL JAMES PARKS (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DARRELL JAMES PARKS (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DARRELL JAMES PARKS.(adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/3/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. United States Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell James Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Parole Commission
Represented By: Sara Guccini Vanore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?