Wilbon v. Goff et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Laniece Wilbon
Defendant: Daniel E. Goff, Diana K. Dean, Lisa G. Brown and Leslie R. Hell
Case Number: 6:2023cv03139
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 motion extension of time to serve defendants. Plaintiff is granted 60 days from the date of this Order to obtain service upon the defendants as requested in the motion. Signed on 6/29/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 motion for leave to file Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is to file her amended complaint as a new document/filing in this case on or before July 10, 2023. Signed on 6/29/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (View, Pat)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Return of Service unexecuted by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon as to Leslie R. Hell. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Return of Service unexecuted by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon as to Lisa G. Brown. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Return of Service unexecuted by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon as to Diana K. Dean. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Return of Service unexecuted by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon as to Daniel E. Goff. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION for Substituted/Alternative Service, MOTION for extension of time filed by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Claims for Civil Action Lawsuit by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon.
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO SE NOTICE of filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Continuation of #13 Civil Cover Sheet) by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Hanna, Jaime) Modified on 6/21/2023 to reflect the filing was received via EDSS. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Continuation of Civil Cover Sheet) by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 6/20/2023 to reflect the filing was received via EDSS on 6/18/2023. Filing date corrected (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Names and Workplace Titles of Individuals in an Authority/ A Particular Area or Topic by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 6/20/2023 to reflect the filing was received via EDSS on 6/18/2023. Filing date corrected. (Furtak, Rebecca).
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Amend filed by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/29/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Claims for Civil Action Lawsuit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Complaint, #5 Appellate Decision, #6 Appellate Decision on Request for Reconsideration, #7 Concise and Plain Statements of the Facts, #8 Factual Allegations, #9 Counts- Causes of Action)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pro Se NOTICE of filing by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is 6:23-cv-03139-MDH. (This is a text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. Service due by 8/16/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Factual Allegations, Legal Claims and Certificate of Mailing for Leslie Hell by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Attachments: #1 Legal Claims Against Leslie Hell, #2 Certificate of Mailing)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Factual Allegations, Legal Claims and Certificate of Mailing for Lisa Brown by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Attachments: #1 Legal Claims Against Lisa Brown, #2 Certificate of Mailing)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Factual Allegations, Legal Claims and Certificate of Mailing for Diana Dean by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Attachments: #1 Legal Claims Against Diana Dean, #2 Certificate of Mailing)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Factual Allegations, Legal Claims and Certificate of Mailing for Daniel Goff by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. (Attachments: #1 Legal Claims Against Daniel Goff, #2 Certificate of Mailing)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Summons provided to Plaintiff in person in the Springfield Divisional office. (Furtak, Rebecca)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Application for Leave to File Action without Payment of Fees; denying #2 Application for Appointment of Counsel. Filing fee due by 6/12/2023. Signed on 5/8/23 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO) Modified on 5/9/2023 to reflect a copy of the Order was mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberly Laniece Wilbon. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Jaime)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 5/26/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilbon v. Goff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Laniece Wilbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana K. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie R. Hell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?