Goforth et al v. Transform Holdco LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Goforth, Malinda Goforth, MG Management Co., LLC and Malinda's Sugar and Spice, LLC
Defendant: Transform Holdco LLC, Hometown Midco, LLC, ESL Investments, Inc. and ESL Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 6:2023cv03167
Filed: June 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Malinda Goforth, Matthew Goforth, MG Management Co., LLC, Malinda's Sugar and Spice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Fax, Nicholas)
July 17, 2023 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/17/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
July 6, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants and emailed to Plaintiff's attorney for service. (Hanna, Jaime)
June 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
June 7, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiffs' Forms due by 6/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8488854. Service due by 9/5/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fax, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goforth et al v. Transform Holdco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Goforth
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Goforth
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MG Management Co., LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda's Sugar and Spice, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform Holdco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown Midco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESL Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESL Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?