Crawford & Company et al v. Morris DDS PC et al
Plaintiff: Crawford & Company and Broadspire Services, Inc.
Defendant: Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC, TERESA FAYE MORRIS, A/K/A TERESA F MOODY, Teresa Faye Morris and Teresa F. Moody
Case Number: 6:2023cv03204
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Filing 37 PRO SE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC.(Siegert, Karen)
August 29, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE to take deposition of O'Bannon Banking Company, d/b/a O'Bannon Bank filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stine, Kevin)
August 28, 2023 Filing 35 PRO SE NOTICE of filing Declaration of Attempted Service by Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC (Siegert, Karen)
August 25, 2023 Filing 34 Before the Court is Defendant Teresa Faye Morris' pro se Motions. (Doc. #31; Doc. #32.) For reasons stated within, the motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 8/25/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna) (Clerk's Note: A copy of the order was sent by first class mail to: Teresa Faye Morris, 3905 E. Woodside Way, Springfield, MO 65809.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 33 Before the Court is Defendant Teresa Faye Morris' pro se Motion. (Doc. #30.) Defendant requests an extension to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. For good cause stated, the motion is GRANTED. Ms. Morris may respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before September 1, 2023. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Signed on 8/25/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna) (Clerk's Note: A copy of the order was sent by first class mail to: Teresa Faye Morris, 3905 E. Woodside Way, Springfield, MO 65809.) (Murphy-Carr, Shauna).
August 25, 2023 Filing 32 PRO SE MOTION for order for Access filed by Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
August 25, 2023 Filing 31 Pro Se MOTION for order filed by Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF provided to Defendant at Springfield Clerk's window. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 25, 2023 Filing 30 PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
August 24, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company - AMENDED Certificate of Service of Discovery filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company.(White, Joseph)
August 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of filing Amended Declaration of Service by Robert Cirtin by Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company re #26 Notice of filing (White, Joseph)
August 23, 2023 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company of Discovery filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company.(White, Joseph)
August 23, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of filing of Declaration of Service of Robert Cirtin by Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company (White, Joseph)
August 18, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Discovery filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Plaintiffs Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company.(White, Joseph)
August 16, 2023 Filing 24 PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Teresa Faye Morris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit (Not Notarized))(Hanna, Jaime)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Before the Court is Defendant Teresa Faye Morris pro se Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Doc. #22.) Defendant states she has been unable to secure the services of an attorney and requests the Court appoint counsel to represent her in this matter. For the reasons stated within. the motion is denied. Additionally, while Defendants' answers were due August 11, 2023, the Court will extend the deadline. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' answers are now due August 25, 2023. Signed on 8/16/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna) (Clerk's Note: A copy of this order mailed via first class mail to : Teresa Faye Morris, 3905 E. Woodside Way, Springfield, MO 65809. )
August 15, 2023 Filing 21 Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel O'Bannon Banking Company to ProduceUnredacted Records. (Doc. #20.) Upon review, the Court determines that Plaintiffs have established good cause to grant the requested relief as detailed within. Signed on 8/15/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 Pro Se MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Defendant. (Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 8/16/2023 to reflect the filing date of 8/11/2023. (Furtak, Rebecca).
August 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to compel (Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel O'Bannon Banking Company to Produce Unredacted Records) filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/24/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stine, Kevin)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: Plaintiff's #18 second motion for expedited discovery. Plaintiffs may issue non-party subpoenas and otherwise fully avail themselves of the discovery provisions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to obtain discovery from non-parties as of the date hereof including, but not limited to, discovery directed to the various non-party witnesses identified in Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed on 7/31/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
July 28, 2023 Filing 18 Second MOTION to expedite discovery filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stine, Kevin)
July 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE (SEALED) by Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company re #16 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Confidential Agreement and General Release of All Claims (referenced as Personal Injury Settlement in Verified Complaint) (Stine, Kevin)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 This case is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order to Maintain Confidentiality of Personal Injury Settlement and Related Claim Materials. (Doc. #15.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED as contained within. Signed on 7/27/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
July 24, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for protective order to Maintain Confidentiality of Personal Injury Settlement and Related Claim Materials filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stine, Kevin)
July 24, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Crawford & Company, Broadspire Services, Inc. Teresa Faye Morris served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023; Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Stine, Kevin) Modified on 8/18/2023 to correct names of parties served (Hanna, Jaime).
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service unexecuted by Crawford & Company, Broadspire Services, Inc. as to Crawford & Company, Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Stine, Kevin)
July 24, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Broadspire Services, Inc. filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Plaintiff Broadspire Services, Inc..(Stine, Kevin)
July 24, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Crawford & Company filed by Kevin Arthur Stine on behalf of Plaintiff Crawford & Company.(Stine, Kevin)
July 12, 2023 SUMMONSES (2) ISSUED as to Teresa Faye Morris, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC. (Siegert, Karen)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kevin Stine and Tim Colletti for Broadspire Services, Inc. and Crawford & Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 11, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to allow Tim Colletti to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8530421) filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. (White, Joseph)
July 11, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to allow Kevin A. Stine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8530404) filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. (White, Joseph)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery. (Doc. #5 .) For good cause shown, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(d)(1), the motion is GRANTED. Signed on 7/11/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for discovery /Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (White, Joseph)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (Hanna, Jaime)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy no longer associated with this case. New case number is: 23-3204-CV-S-SRB. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Hanna, Jaime)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction, and Damages against TERESA FAYE MORRIS, A/K/A TERESA F MOODY, Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC filed by Joseph Taylor White on behalf of Crawford & Company, Broadspire Services, Inc.. Filing fee $402, receipt number 759926. Service due by 10/10/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Glenn Morrison)(White, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced with signed copy on 7/11/2023) (Hanna, Jaime).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford & Company et al v. Morris DDS PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawford & Company
Represented By: Joseph Taylor White
Represented By: Kevin Arthur Stine
Represented By: Tim Colletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Taylor White
Represented By: Kevin Arthur Stine
Represented By: Tim Colletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Faye Morris DDS PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA FAYE MORRIS, A/K/A TERESA F MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Faye Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa F. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?