Lamb v. Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Plaintiff: Gerald Lamb and Judith Lamb
Defendant: Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2023cv03301
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 19 DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Gary Oxenhandler(Barrett, Alexander)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2025 01:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 11/15/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 15, 2023 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 02:30 PM has been cancelled. A scheduling order will be entered. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to change venue or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by J Lindsey Ikram on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald Lamb, Judith Lamb. Reply suggestions due by 11/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Suggestions in Opposition)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Ikram, J)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 DESIGNATION Joint Designation Of Mediator Certificate by Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. (Barrett, Alexander)
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Jury Trial Order by Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. (Barrett, Alexander)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 the joint motion for extension of time. The parties shall designate a mediator on or before November 14, 2023. Signed on 11/1/2023 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue or in the Alternative Compel Arbitration is due on or before November 14, 2023. In the future, motions of this nature are to be filed three (3) days in advance of the deadline. Signed on 11/1/2023 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Designate Mediator filed by Alexander Barrett on behalf of Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barrett, Alexander)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #9 MOTION to change venue or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by J Lindsey Ikram on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Ikram, J)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to change venue or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Alexander Barrett on behalf of Defendant Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Barrett, Alexander)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to change venue or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Alexander Barrett on behalf of Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/31/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barrett, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2023: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hanna, Jaime).
September 27, 2023 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before October 20, 2023. Signed on 9/26/2023 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Alexander Barrett on behalf of Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barrett, Alexander)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Nicolette Carmen Rodriguez on behalf of Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated (Rodriguez, Nicolette)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/1/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2023 02:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/25/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal by Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal)(Barrett, Alexander)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (Hanna, Jaime)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT IN DIVERSITY CASE filed by Alexander Barrett on behalf of Defendant Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated.(Barrett, Alexander)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Taney County, case number 2346-CC00097, filed by Alexander Barrett. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8636892. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrett, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb v. Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lamb
Represented By: J Lindsey Ikram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Lamb
Represented By: J Lindsey Ikram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Represented By: Nicolette Carmen Rodriguez
Represented By: Alexander Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?