Gammill, Inc. v. Cartwright et al
Counter Defendant: Gammill, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright and Everything Longarm, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv03055
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Fraud Injunction Statute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 33 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C Wimes: Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 4/23/2024. Court hears arguments. Matter taken under advisement.Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/16/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Randall Thompson. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Matthew Dart. Time in court: 1:30 pm to 2:40 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
April 23, 2024 Filing 32 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Gammill, Inc.. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Thompson, Randall)
April 23, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/19/2024 as Document No. 31, Reply Suggestions in Support. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 19, 2024 Filing 31 Reply MOTION for temporary restraining order and Suggestions in Support and Preliminary Injunction filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Randall)
April 12, 2024 Filing 30 Verified ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Gammill, Inc..(Thompson, Randall)
April 12, 2024 Filing 29 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of Defendants Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 4/26/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Hodes, Garrett)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED Defendants' motion for extension of time (Doc. #21) is GRANTED IN PART. The parties shall adhere to the following scheduled: 1.Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. #6) on or before April 12, 2024;2.Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. #6) on or before April 19, 2024; and 3.The parties will participate in a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. #6) on April 23, 2024, at 1:30pm in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City, Missouri. ORDERED Plaintiff's motion to expedite discovery (Doc. #8) remains pending to be taken up at the hearing on April 23, 2024 and Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages (Doc. #5) is GRANTED. Signed on 3/28/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 28, 2024 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2024. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Randall Thompson, Christina Brunty. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Matthew Dart, Garrett Hodes. Time in court: 9:00 a.m. to 9:25 a.m.. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 27, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 25, 2024 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Everything Longarm, LLC filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of Defendants Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC.(Hodes, Garrett)
March 25, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 3/28/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Conference call information emailed to counsel.
March 25, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/22/2024 as Document No. 23, Corporate Disclosure Statement. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Matthew B. Dart for Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright and Everything Longarm, LLC. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 22, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of filing of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everything Longarm, LLC (Hodes, Garrett)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/4/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2024 11:30 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Signed on 3/22/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 22, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #8 MOTION to expedite discovery, #6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 , #6 ) (Hodes, Garrett)
March 22, 2024 Filing 20 Defendants' Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Gammill, Inc. on behalf of Everything Longarm, LLC, Heather Sue Cartwright, Douglas Brent Cartwright.(Hodes, Garrett)
March 22, 2024 Filing 19 Motion to allow Matthew B. Dart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8924464) filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC. (Attorney Garrett Mark Hodes added to party Douglas Brent Cartwright(pty:dft), Attorney Garrett Mark Hodes added to party Heather Sue Cartwright(pty:dft), Attorney Garrett Mark Hodes added to party Everything Longarm, LLC(pty:dft))(Hodes, Garrett)
March 22, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Entries of Appearance for Counsel for Defendants by Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC (Hodes, Garrett) Modified on 3/25/2024 to correct docket text. (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gammill, Inc.. Heather Sue Cartwright served on 3/01/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Brunty, Christina) Modified on 3/11/2024 to correct service/answer dates. (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gammill, Inc.. Everything Longarm, LLC served on 3/01/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Brunty, Christina) Modified on 3/11/2024 to correct service/answer dates. (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gammill, Inc.. Douglas Brent Cartwright served on 3/01/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Brunty, Christina) Modified on 3/11/2024 to correct service/answer dates. (Furtak, Rebecca).
March 8, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/7/2024 as Document No. 12, 13, 14, Return of Service (non cmp). The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event as follows: Civil -> Service of Process -> Return of Service of Complaint Executed. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Douglas Brent Cartwright (Brunty, Christina)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Heather Sue Cartwright (Brunty, Christina)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Everything Longarm, LLC (Brunty, Christina)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Gammill, Inc..(Thompson, Randall)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (Hanna, Jaime)
February 27, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 2/26/2024 as Document No. 1-4, Corporate Disclosure Statement. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event: Civil > Other Filings > Discovery Documents > Disclosure of Corporate Interests. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Hanna, Jaime)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION to expedite discovery filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Gammill, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to expedite discovery filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Gammill, Inc.. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Kaytlin E Kopen on behalf of Gammill, Inc. (Attorney Kaytlin E Kopen added to party Gammill, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kopen, Kaytlin)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Christina C Brunty on behalf of Gammill, Inc. (Attorney Christina C Brunty added to party Gammill, Inc.(pty:pla))(Brunty, Christina)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc. (Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC filed by Randall Thompson on behalf of Gammill, Inc.. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8883623. Service due by 5/28/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, # 4 Corporate Disclosure)(Thompson, Randall)
February 26, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas Brent Cartwright, Heather Sue Cartwright, Everything Longarm, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammill, Inc. v. Cartwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gammill, Inc.
Represented By: Christina C Brunty
Represented By: Kaytlin E Kopen
Represented By: Randall Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Douglas Brent Cartwright
Represented By: Matthew Dart
Represented By: Garrett Mark Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Heather Sue Cartwright
Represented By: Matthew Dart
Represented By: Garrett Mark Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Everything Longarm, LLC
Represented By: Garrett Mark Hodes
Represented By: Matthew Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?