Whitford v. Michael et al
Plaintiff: Makueeyapee D. Whitford
Defendant: Jim Salmonsen, Cynthia Wolken, Reginald D. Michael and D.J. Godfrey
Case Number: 6:2020cv00080
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Intent to Amend by Makueeyapee D. Whitford re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. (TAG)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/9/2020. (HEG)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (12 pgs.) (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Makueeyapee D. Whitford. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (10 pgs.), #2 Appendix (3 pgs.), #3 Appendix (17 pgs.), #4 Appendix (108 pgs.), #5 Appendix (7 pgs.), #6 Appendix (30 pgs.)) (TAG) Modified on 12/10/2020: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (2 pgs.) by Plaintiff Makueeyapee D. Whitford (Attachments: #1 Account Statement (2 pgs.)) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitford v. Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Salmonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Wolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald D. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makueeyapee D. Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?