Interstate Service Provider, Inc. v. Jordan et al
Plaintiff: Interstate Service Provider, Inc.
Defendant: Jordan, Michael Minniear, Ramone Smith, Billy Wilks, Jack West, Johnny Garcia, Clint Johnson, Gerald Moore, Carlos Trejo, Tanza Townsend, Christopher Rodriguez, Malcolm Wiltz, William Gee, Raymond Brock, Jordan Rutzen, Marvin Washington, James Rizzatto, Jared Henson, Asa Weir, Dennis Croft, Reynaldo Pardillo, Shannon Gay, Keymon Houston, Marquis Swygart, Christopher Thompson, Michael Kelly, Recco Lewis, Larry Fredrick, Xavier Jones, Robert Mays, Michael Bullard, Luis Martinez, Tim Burks, Darryl Cunningham, Kelly Higginbotham, Victor Alexander, Renard Brown, Byron Jones, Steven Carter, Jose Cabrera Roque, Darrell Grimes, Anthony Augusta, John McCarty, White Line Systems, LLC, Christopher Dennis, Cory Hamilton, Adam Gaither, Joshua Williams, Kenneth Gay, Anthony Beaver, Floyd Citizen, Johnnie Hunter, Vincent Vasquez, Terry McCullough, Jerry Young, James Dickson, Ryan Fitzpatrick, Guadalupe Alvarez, Kris Childs, Almus Word, Jimmie Davis, Charles Sherrard, Howard Jackson, Mike McGruder, Ulysses Granger, Charles Okech, Nkaina Nkaina, Ronnie Allison, Alexis James, Zachary Fennell, Arthur Jones, Randall Thomas, William Ford, Rex Bodden, Rick Montez, Christian Lark, Timothy Robertson, Roderick Davis, Lester Perez, Mark Ferrell, Dexter C. Smith, Todd Lyons, Jameel Orday, Robert Soliz, Charley Jordan, Jonathan Polk, Stephen Alston, James White, David Arteaga, Richard Murrell, Waldo Castillo, Robert Thomason, David McGlothlin, Jordan Wing, Mathew Geiss, Lanter Delivery Systems, LLC, Willie MacQueenette, Seigfried Cooper, Jackie Norman, Richard Scott, Erick Trejo, Richard Moore, Brian Broadnax, Brian Weibel, Tyree Williams, Dreaphys Sanders, Roy Monroe, Tim Ellis, Chris Weaver, Wayne Jordan, Johnny Moses, Chris Parker, Schann Bratton, Thomas Williams, Jason Pantohan, Brian Whitaker, Ricardo Martinez, Austin Spann, Anthony Jones and Chris Montero
Case Number: TXE/4:21-CV-00267
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. (4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00542, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00557, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00558, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00561, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00562, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00730, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00746, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00748, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00749, 4 in FLS/0:21-cv-60670, 4 in FLS/1:21-cv-21182, #9 in MDL No. 3008), ( #1 in MDL No. 3008) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/27/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00748, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, FLS/0:21-cv-60670, FLS/1:21-cv-21182, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (DP)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (16 in FLM/6:21-cv-00542, 16 in FLM/6:21-cv-00561, 16 in FLM/6:21-cv-00562, 16 in FLM/8:21-cv-00730, 16 in FLM/8:21-cv-00746, 16 in FLM/8:21-cv-00749, #33 in MDL No. 3008), ( #1 in MDL No. 3008) Filed by Defendants James A Ely, #et al.Victor Alexander, Ronnie Allison, Stephen Alston, Guadalupe Alvarez, David Arteaga, Anth ony Augusta, Anthony Beaver, Rex Bodden, Schann Bratton, Brian Broadnax, Raymond Brock, Renard Brown, Michael Bullard, Tim Burks, Steven Carter, Waldo Castillo, Kris Childs, Floyd Citizen, Seigfried Cooper, Dennis Croft, Darryl Cunningham, Jimmie Davis, Roderick Davis, Christopher Dennis, James Dickson, Tim Ellis, Zachary Fennell, Mark Ferrell, Ryan Fitzpatrick, William Ford, Larry Fredrick, Adam Gaither, Johnny Garcia, Kenneth Gay, Shannon Gay, William Gee, Mathew Geiss, Ulysses Granger, Darrell Grimes, Cory Hamilton, Jared Henson, Kelly Higginbotham, Keymon Houston, Johnnie Hunter, Howard Jackson, Alexis James, Clint Johnson, Anthony Jones, Arthur Jones, Byron Jones, Xavier Jones, Charley Jordan, Wayne Jordan, Michael Kelly, Lanter Delivery Systems, LLC, Christian Lark, Recco Lewis, Todd Lyons, Willie MacQueenette, Luis Martinez, Ricardo Martinez, Robert Mays, John McCarty, Terry McCullough, David McGlothlin, Mike McGruder, Michael Minniear, Roy Monroe, Chris Montero, Rick Montez, Gerald Moore, Richard Moore, Johnny Moses, Richard Murrell, Nkaina Nkaina, Jackie Norman, Charles Okech, Jameel Orday, Jason Pantohan, Reynaldo Pardillo, Chris Parker, Lester Perez, Jonathan Polk, James Rizzatto, Timothy Robertson, Christopher Rodriguez, Jose Cabrera Roque, Jordan Rutzen, Dreaphys Sanders, Richard Scott, Charles Sherrard, Dexter C. Smith, Ramone Smith, Robert Soliz, Austin Spann, Marquis Swygart, Randall Thomas, Robert Thomason, Christopher Thompson, Tanza Townsend, Carlos Trejo, Erick Trejo, Vincent Vasquez, Marvin Washington, Chris Weaver, Brian Weibel, Asa Weir, Jack West, Brian Whitaker, James White, White Line Systems, LLC, Billy Wilks, Joshua Williams, Thomas Williams, Tyree Williams, Malcolm Wiltz, Jordan Wing, Almus Word, Jerry Young, Joe Hernandez, Hugo Cintron, Jason Coffey, Rafael Hernandez, Eric Hillsman, Ray Miller, Travis Miller, Reginald Moore, Alex Pellot, Isaac Stokes, Jack E. Sykes, Jr., Ronald Nunez, Wilbert Oduardo, Anthony Velez, Murphy Express Logistics, LLC, Murphy Express, LLC, Antjuan Lee Cain, Jamar Mikell, Delvis L Stallworth, Mike Martin, Jacob Greene #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - Current Schedule of Actions, #2 Exhibit 16 - Confidentiality and Non-Solicitation Comparison, #3 Exhibit 17 - Sample Duplicative Discovery, #4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267, WIW/3:21-cv-00308 (Braunel, Matthew)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 24 in MDL No. 3008, 16 in ILS/3:21-cv-00411) Filed by Plaintiffs C. Pepper Logistics, LLC, #et al.Independent Service Provider, LLC #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00748, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, FLS/0:21-cv-60670, FLS/1:21-cv-21182, FLS/1:21-cv-21573, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267, WIW/3:21-cv-00308 (Cooper, Kenneth) Modified on 5/25/2021 (DP)(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES & ADDED MDL LINK).
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3008) -- Identifying Corporate Parent White Nut House Holding Company, LLC for White Line Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Witcher, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2021 (DP)(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME).
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3008) Filed by Robert Lance Witcher on behalf of Defendants Victor Alexander, #et al.Ronnie Allison, Stephen Alston, Guadalupe Alvarez, Dav id Arteaga, Anthony Augusta, Anthony Beaver, Rex Bodden, Schann Bratton, Brian Broadnax, Raymond Brock, Renard Brown, Michael Bullard, Tim Burks, Steven Carter, Waldo Castillo, Kris Childs, Floyd Citizen, Seigfried Cooper, Dennis Croft, Darryl Cunningham, Jimmie Davis, Roderick Davis, Christopher Dennis, James Dickson, Tim Ellis, Zachary Fennell, Mark Ferrell, Ryan Fitzpatrick, William Ford, Larry Fredrick, Adam Gaither, Johnny Garcia, Kenneth Gay, Shannon Gay, William Gee, Mathew Geiss, Ulysses Granger, Darrell Grimes, Cory Hamilton, Jared Henson, Kelly Higginbotham, Keymon Houston, Johnnie Hunter, Howard Jackson, Alexis James, Clint Johnson, Anthony Jones, Arthur Jones, Byron Jones, Xavier Jones, Charley Jordan, Wayne Jordan, Michael Kelly, Christian Lark, Recco Lewis, Todd Lyons, Willie MacQueenette, Luis Martinez, Ricardo Martinez, Robert Mays, John McCarty, Terry McCullough, David McGlothlin, Mike McGruder, Michael Minniear, Roy Monroe, Chris Montero, Rick Montez, Gerald Moore, Richard Moore, Johnny Moses, Richard Murrell, Nkaina Nkaina, Jackie Norman, Charles Okech, Jameel Orday, Jason Pantohan, Reynaldo Pardillo, Chris Parker, Lester Perez, Jonathan Polk, James Rizzatto, Timothy Robertson, Christopher Rodriguez, Jose Cabrera Roque, Jordan Rutzen, Dreaphys Sanders, Richard Scott, Charles Sherrard, Dexter C. Smith, Ramone Smith, Robert Soliz, Austin Spann, Marquis Swygart, Randall Thomas, Robert Thomason, Christopher Thompson, Tanza Townsend, Carlos Trejo, Erick Trejo, Vincent Vasquez, Marvin Washington, Chris Weaver, Brian Weibel, Asa Weir, Jack West, Brian Whitaker, James White, White Line Systems, LLC, Billy Wilks, Joshua Williams, Thomas Williams, Tyree Williams, Malcolm Wiltz, Jordan Wing, Almus Word, Jerry Young #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to NOA, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, TX E/4:21-cv-00267 (Witcher, Robert)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00542) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendants Ronald Nunez, #et al.Wilbert Oduardo, Anthony Velez #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00746) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendant Mike Martin (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00561) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendant Joe Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00730) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendant Jacob Greene (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00557) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendants Errol Gordon, #et al.Theron McKiver, Marshall Morris #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADD MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/8:21-cv-00749) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendants Hugo Cintron, #et al.Jason Coffey, Rafael Hernandez, Eric Hillsman, Ray Miller, Travis Miller, Reginald Moore, Alex Pellot, Isaac Stokes, Jack E. Sykes, Jr. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Parties Represented, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00562) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendants Antjuan Lee Cain, #et al.Jamar Mikell, Delvis L Stallworth #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3008, 4 in FLM/6:21-cv-00558) Filed by Sarah J. Kuehnel on behalf of Defendants Ismael Aponte, Marion A Meeks (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, ILS/3:21-cv-00411, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Kuehnel, Sarah) Modified on 5/13/2021 (DP)(ADDED MDL LINK).
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3008) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Lanter Delivery Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Braunel, Matthew)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3008) Filed by Matthew A. Braunel on behalf of Defendant Lanter Delivery Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (Braunel, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3008) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 5/12/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 5/12/2021. Responses due on or before 5/19/2021. Reply, if any, due on or before 5/26/2021. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/28/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3008, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21-cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00748, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, FLS/0:21-cv-60670, FLS/1:21-cv-21182, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (LH)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 MDL Number 3008 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 34) Associated Cases: Pending No. 34, FLM/6:21-cv-00542, FLM/6:21-cv-00557, FLM/6:21- cv-00558, FLM/6:21-cv-00561, FLM/6:21-cv-00562, FLM/8:21-cv-00730, FLM/8:21-cv-00746, FLM/8:21-cv-00748, FLM/8:21-cv-00749, FLS/0:21-cv-60670, FLS/1:21-cv-21182, TXE/4:21-cv-00267 (LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interstate Service Provider, Inc. v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Service Provider, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Messina, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minniear
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramone Smith
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Wilks
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack West
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Garcia
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Johnson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Trejo
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanza Townsend
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Wiltz
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gee
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Brock
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Rutzen
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Washington
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rizzatto
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Henson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Weir
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Croft
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo Pardillo
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Gay
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keymon Houston
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis Swygart
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Thompson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kelly
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recco Lewis
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Fredrick
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mays
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bullard
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Martinez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Burks
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Cunningham
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Higginbotham
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Alexander
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renard Brown
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Carter
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cabrera Roque
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Grimes
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Augusta
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCarty
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Line Systems, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dennis
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Hamilton
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gaither
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Williams
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gay
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Beaver
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Citizen
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Hunter
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Vasquez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry McCullough
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Young
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dickson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Alvarez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Childs
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almus Word
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Davis
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sherrard
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jackson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McGruder
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulysses Granger
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Okech
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nkaina Nkaina
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Allison
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis James
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Fennell
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Thomas
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ford
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Bodden
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Montez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Lark
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Robertson
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Davis
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Perez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ferrell
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter C. Smith
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameel Orday
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Soliz
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charley Jordan
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Polk
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Alston
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James White
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Arteaga
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Murrell
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldo Castillo
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thomason
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McGlothlin
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Wing
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Geiss
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanter Delivery Systems, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Braunel
Represented By: David Bergstrand Jinkins
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie MacQueenette
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seigfried Cooper
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Norman
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Scott
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Trejo
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Broadnax
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Weibel
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyree Williams
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreaphys Sanders
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Monroe
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ellis
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Weaver
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Jordan
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Moses
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Parker
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schann Bratton
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pantohan
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Martinez
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Spann
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Montero
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Represented By: Robert Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?