El-Tabech v. Houston, et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed A. El-Tabech
Defendant: Francis Britten, Mary Carmichael, Paul Church, Harold Clarke, Randy Cole, Elizabeth Conley, Robert Houston, Mike Kenney, Douglas Sell, Brian Shipman, Dave Thomas and Janssen Williams
Case Number: 4:2004cv03231
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER to Withdraw Exhibits or to Show Cause Why Exhibits Should Not be Destroyed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MLF, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs (Filing No. 270 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's amended motion for attorneys' fees and costs (Filing No. 278 ) is granted. Attorneys' fees in the amo unt of $73,209.67, plus interest at the legal rate under 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from and after this date, are assessed in favor of plaintiff and against defendants, payable to plaintiff's counsel. Costs in the amount of $935.40, plus i nterest at the legal rate under 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from and after this date, are taxed in favor of a plaintiff and against defendants, payable to plaintiff's counsel. A judgment in conformity with this memorandum and order will be entered this date. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER - This matter is before the court after a telephonic scheduling conference with the parties after remand from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff shall submit a fee application for the contested supplemental attorney fees on or before December 6, 2010. 2. Defendants shall respond thereto by December 20, 2010. 3. Plaintiff shall file a satisfaction of judgment (Filing No. 204 ) on or before November 17, 2010. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion for a stay of enforcement of the judgment 249 is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's supplemental motion for attorney's fees 233 is granted. Plaintiff is awarded an additional $73,360.20 in attorney's fees and $271.20 in recoverable costs. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER - This matter is before the court on Assistant Attorney General Matthew A. Workss motion to withdraw as counsel 241 . Assistant Attorney General Ryan C. Gilbride has entered an appearance. Accordingly, Assistant Attorney General Matthew A. Works's motion to withdraw as counsel 241 is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER 1. Plaintiffs objection to defendants brief and evidence 217 is overruled. 2. Plaintiffs motion for contempt is set for oral argument on February 19, 2009, at 3:00 p.m., Courtroom No. 3, Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (PCV, )
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 219 Motion to Extend. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows:1. Plaintiff shall file Reply Brief and Index of Evidence in Support of Motionfor Contempt on or before November 7, 2008. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (PCV, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 197 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time until 2/8/2008 to file response to 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Tabech v. Houston, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Britten
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carmichael
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Clarke
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Cole
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Conley
Represented By: Travis P. O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kenney
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Sell
Represented By: Ryan C. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Thomas
Represented By: Travis P. O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Williams
Represented By: Travis P. O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed A. El-Tabech
Represented By: Ted J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?