Leonor v. Houston
Case Number: 4:2005cv03162
Filed: July 12, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 107 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leonor's Motion to Amend (Filing No. 103 ) and Motion to Reopen Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(6) (Filing No. 104 ) are denied. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 87 ) and Motion for Leave to Expand Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 95 ) are denied without prejudice to reasserti on before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal is denied as moot. (Filing No. 86 .) Because Petitione r was previously given leave to proceed IFP, he may now "proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without further authorization" in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 89 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion for Reconsideration under Rule 60(b) (Filing No. 82 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The State Court Records filed as attachments to Filing No. 19 , be returned to the Nebraska Attorney General's Office, counsel for Respondent, for appropriate disposition. The State Court Records may be picked up in Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonor v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?