Cole et al v. Houston et al
Case Number: |
4:2006cv03314 |
Filed: |
December 29, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 2, 2008 |
Filing
139
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff Marvel Jones is permitted to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.21 by 1/2/09. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, plaintiff's institut ion shall collection the additional monthly payments. The clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's institution and the 8th Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed as directed and to pro se party) (JSF) Modified on 12/2/2008 to include plaintiff's name (JSF).
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing
137
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding: Notice of Appeal to USCA 135 filed by Marvel Jones ; Plaintiff shall have until November 17, 2008, in which to file a notice of withdrawal of appeal in this matter. If Plaintiff does file a notice of withdrawal of ap peal, he will not be liable for the $455.00 appellate filing fee and the appeal will not proceed; In the event that Plaintiff seeks to proceed with his appeal, he shall submit to the Clerk of the court either the full $455.00 appellate fili ng fee or a certified copy of his prison account for the last six months no later than November 17, 2008; If Plaintiff does not timely submit the required prison account information, the court will assess an initial appellate partial fee of $35 or such other amount that is reasonable, based on whatever information the court has about the prisoner's finances; The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal in this matter pending further order of the court; and Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/17/2008: deadline for Plaintiff to file notice of withdrawal of appeal. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing
133
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Francis Britten's Motion to Dismiss 129 is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Francis Britten are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memor andum and Order; and Plaintiff's Complaint for Retaliation, construed as a Motion for An Order to Amend Complaint 128 is denied without prejudice to reassertion in a new complaint. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?