True v. Nebraska, State of et al
Case Number: 4:2007cv03280
Filed: December 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The court finds in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER to Withdraw Defendants' Exhibits. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 81 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - The court conducted a telephonic hearing today in this matter. Those who participated included counsel Robert Creager on behalf of the plaintiff'; plaintiff Brian True; and counsel for defendants, Ryan C. Gilbride. The court determined that this matter should be referred to the magistrate judge for progression and scheduling of a pretrial conference and trial. Discovery issues, if any, should be directed to the magistrate judge. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' amended motion for summary judgment 37 is granted. The plaintiff's claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment is entered in conjunction with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ) Modified on 3/4/2009 to remove text regarding paper copies (KBJ).
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - The stay imposed in Filing No. 34 is continued. The parties shall have seven (7) business days from the date an order is filed on the amended motion for summary judgment 37 in which to reschedule a planning conference with the court, if necessary. Counsel for the plaintiff shall contact the court within such time period to schedule the planning conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 33 is denied. The defendants shall have to on or before September 26, 2008, to file a motion for summary judgment related to the plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F iling No. 30). The plaintiff shall have to on or before October 31, 2008, to file a response to the defendants' motion. Standard reply time shall apply. All proceedings are stayed pending resolution of any motion for summary judgment. The pa rties shall have ten (10) business days from the date an order is filed on the motion for summary judgment, in which to reschedule a planning conference with the court, if necessary. Counsel for the plaintiff shall contact the court within such time period to schedule the planning conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True v. Nebraska, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?