January 22, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER.It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Friday, October 15, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.(C) Place of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Member Cases: 4:08-cv-03033-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03013-RGK-CRZOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before September 24, 2009, the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth their proposed deadlines for continued progression of these cases to trial, including deadlines for disclosing experts and their reports and for completion of discovery, and a statement of when these cases will be ready for trial. Member Cases: 4:08-cv-03033-RGK-RGK, 4:09-cv-03013-RGK-RGKOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by Christopher M. Ferdico and Baylor, Evnen, Curtiss, Grimit & Witt law firm as counsel of record for defendants and third-party plaintiffs, Jeffery A. Gohsman and CRST International, Inc., (filing no. 50 ), is granted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (47) Parties Joint Motion to Continue in case 4:08-cv-03033-RGK-DLP; granting (37) Motion to Continue in case 4:09-cv-03013-RGK-DLP. On or before August 20, 2009, the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth th eir proposed deadlines for continued progression of these cases to trial, including deadlines for disclosing experts and their reports and for completion of discovery, and a statement of when the case will be ready for trial. Member Cases: 4:08-cv-03033-RGK-DLP, 4:09-cv-03013-RGK-DLPOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAE)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
46
ORDER CLARIFYING CONSOLIDATION - Upon review of the court files, the court finds that an order should be issued clarifying the previously-entered consolidation orders in the above-captioned cases in order to incorporate CM/ECF functionality improveme nts and to instruct the parties regarding the future filing of documents in these cases. Accordingly, 1. Cases Nos. 4:08cv3033 and 4:09cv3013 are hereby consolidated for discovery, trial, and all other purposes. 2. Case No. 4:08cv3033 is hereby desig nated as the "Lead Case." Case No. 4:09cv3013 is hereby designated as a "Member Case." If properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in all Member Cases. ETC. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before July 30, 2009, the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth their proposed deadlines for continued progression of these cases to trial, including deadlines for disclosing experts and their reports and for completion of discovery, and a statement of when the case will be ready for trial. The planning conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Piester on August 11, 2009 is cancelled. ( Case Management Deadline set for 7/30/2009 - Deadline for filing of motion setting forth proposed deadlines.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAE)
|
March 18, 2009 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases filed in 4:09cv3013. 1. A copy of this memorandum and order shall be filed in 4:08cv3033, and provided to the assigned district judges. 2. A copy of this memorandum and order, together with ap plicable docket sheets, shall be provided to Chief Judge Bataillon, so he may reassign them in accordance with NEGenR 1.4(4). 3. Within three weeks after reassignment has been completed, counsel shall confer and inform the undersigned by letter of th eir joint, or if necessary, separate, views on when the consolidated trial, final pretrial conference, and appropriate deadlines may be set. Alternatively, counsel may request a conference with the undersigned for this purpose by telephoning my judicial assistant, Carol Reitz, at 402-437-1670. Additional scheduling orders may be entered following such procedure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (Copies provided as directed.) (JAB)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing
33
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE- IT IS ORDERED: The parties' joint stipulation for continuance, filing 32 , is granted and the provisions of the court's earlier, initial progression order remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following shall apply: Deposition Deadline: June 30, 2009. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for June 30, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United St ates Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska. Jury trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of July 13, 2009 for four days, in Lincoln, Nebraska, before the Honorable Richard G. Kopf, United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
|