Barika African Market, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Agriculture
Plaintiff: Barika African Market, Inc., Sampson Npinmee and Veronica Npinmee
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 4:2009cv03111
Filed: June 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 07:2023 Food Stamp Program
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties, and upon their joint oral motion, (filing no. 59 ), the court's prior progression order, (filing no. 48 ) is amended. The deadline for the plaintiffs' response to the defendant 9;s motion for summary judgment, (filing no. 51 ), is February 25, 2011. The deadline for the defendant's reply is March 14, 2011. 3-day Non-Jury Trial set for 6/27/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Extend. The deadline for filing a summary judgment motion is extended to January 12, 2011. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw filed by Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick, counsel of record for plaintiffs Barika African Market, Inc., Sampson Npimnee, Veronica Npimnee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Joint Motion to Continue. The progression schedule for this case is stayed pending further order of the court. Plaintiffs' current counsel, Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick, shall file his mo tion to withdraw on or before September 30, 2010. On or before October 21, 2010, plaintiff Barika African Market, Inc., shall obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf, and plaintiffs Sampson N pimnee and Veronica Npimnee shall either: (1) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf; or (2) file a statement notifying the court of their intent to litigate this case without counsel. With in ten days after the plaintiffs representation issues are resolved, (see paragraph 3 of this order), the parties shall contact my chambers to schedule a telephonic conference to discuss the progression schedule for this case. Plaintiffs' curre nt counsel, Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick, shall promptly provide a copy of this memorandum and order to the plaintiffs, and shall file a certificate of service (which includes the plaintiffs' addresses along with the date and method of service) stating he has done so. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the joint motion for extension of the final progression order 30 is granted and the court's prior progression order 19 is amended as follows: a non-jury trial is set to commence on January 10, 2011; no more than thr ee days are allocated to the trial of this case and counsel shall plan accordingly; this case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one; the pretrial conference will be he ld before the undersigned magistrate judge on December 16, 2010 at 10:00 a.m.; the deadline for disclosure of experts and, unless otherwise agreed, the deadline for the provision of expert reports is July 30, 2010; the discovery and deposition deadli ne is August 31, 2010. Motions to compel discovery must be filed at least 15 days prior to the discovery and deposition deadline; the deadline for filing motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment or motions to exclude expert testimony on Daubert and related grounds is September 15, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CJP)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, July 1, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.(C)P lace of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall amend the caption of this case to reflect that the United States of America is the only named defendant. The parties' future filings in this case shall contain the amended caption. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement, 7 . Counsel for plaintiff Barika African Market, Inc. shall file the Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before July 16, 2009 or show cause why they cannot comply with the rules of the court. ( Show Cause Deadline set for 7/16/2009.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barika African Market, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barika African Market, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sampson Npinmee
Represented By: Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Npinmee
Represented By: Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?