Bush v. Brandt et al
Plaintiff: Charlie B. Bush, Jr.
Defendant: Donald Brandt and Lancaster County Jail
Case Number: 4:2009cv03138
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.53 by November 30, 2009, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion; After payment of the in itial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. §1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court; The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed and mailed to pro se party)(PCV, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Pay Filing Fee 8 is granted. Plaintiff's future filing fee installments in this matter shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U. S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The Clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiffs current institution. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(JAE)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.53 by August 24, 2009. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 24, 2009: initial partial filing feepayment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(JAE).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Brandt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie B. Bush, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?