Central Platte Natural Resources District v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Central Platte Natural Resources District
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and Farm Service Agency
Case Number: 4:2009cv03198
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Hall
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to GMDA's Amicus Brief. The defendants shall have on or before July 22, 2010, to file and serve their response to GMDAs Amicus Brief. Case Management Deadline set for 7/22/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Groundwater Management Districts Association's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Brief 32 . GMDA shall file its brief as amicus curiae as soon as possible, and no later than July 6, 2010; within 14 days of the date of the filing of GMDAs brief, the parties may file a response to the brief, or, if necessary, request additional time to form a response to the brief. Case Management Deadline set for 7/6/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying as moot 27 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; granting 29 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; granting 30 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff shall file and serve its response to the Defendants Motion for Extension of Time, filing 30, on or before June 11, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting 15 filed by Central Platte Natural Resources District. This case raises an issue of law which will likely be resolved on an administrative record, and without discovery. In additio n, the plaintiff is currently considering whether to move for leave to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, The court will not presently enter a final progression order for this case. The plaintiff is given until January 15, 2010 to move to file an amended complaint. Any motion filed shall state whether the government opposes plaintiff's motion for leave to amend. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Platte Natural Resources District v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Platte Natural Resources District
Represented By: Thomas R. Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?