Farmers Cooperative Company v. Bartlett Grain Company, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2009cv03252
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROY- Pursuant to NECivR 79.1(f) or NECrimR 55.1(g), counsel for defendant, shall either 1) withdraw the following exhibits previously submitted in this matter within 14 cal endar days of the date of this order, or 2) show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed: Exhibit numbers 8, 21-23, 30, 48-49, 51 and 54, from Jury Trial held on May 1, 2012 - May 4, 2012. If counsel fails to withdraw these exhibits as direct ed or to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk's office is directed to destroy the listed exhibits without further notice to the parties or order from the court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER - Plaintiff's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law (filing 113 )is denied. Plaintiff's motion for new trial (filing 115 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Pretrial Order 77 - The final pretrial order is modified to conform to the foregoing memorandum. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Farmers Coop's motion to compel (filing no. 29 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: a. If it has not yet done so, Bartlett's counsel shall certify its Rule 26(a) mandatory disclosures by February 14, 2 001. b. On or before February 28, 2011, Bartlett shall respond to Requests for Production Nos. 3, 5, 6, 7, 10, 11, 12, 14 and 15, but only as to transactions involving Francis Searcey, 136 Group, Diller Grain Co., and Searcey Grain Co. for the time period between January 1, 2005 and September 30, 2007. c. Farmers Coops motion is denied in all other respects. Farmers Coop's motion for sanctions (filing no. 30 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding outstanding discovery disputes.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - The Motion, filing 26 , is sustained, and that the parties herein are granted leave to take the oral deposition of Francis Searcey at his place of confinement, currently The Federal Prison Camp in Duluth, Minnesota. The deposition of Francis Searcey shall by governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 30. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER withdrawing 21 Motion to Compel; withdrawing 23 Motion to Extend. The discovery deadline is set aside. Status Conference set for 1/13/2011 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Cooperative Company v. Bartlett Grain Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?