Doe v. Nebraska State Patrol et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Col. Bryan Tuma, Donald W. Kleine, Timothy F. Dunning and Alex Hayes
Interested Party: Senator Pete Pirsch, Dave Cookson, John Freudenberg, Corey O'Brien, Senator Scott Lautenbaugh and Senator John Harms
Case Number: 4:2009cv03266
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2012 Filing 216 REPLY BRIEF by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 215 REPLY BRIEF Brief(207 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 522 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 214 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Rodney C. Dahlquist, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dahlquist, Rodney)
September 10, 2012 Filing 214 BRIEF (Post-Trial Brief) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 10, 2012 Filing 213 BRIEF (Closing Argument) by Attorney Rodney C. Dahlquist, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dahlquist, Rodney)
August 20, 2012 Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 515-598. Total Number of Pages: 84. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 211 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT regarding Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder. Total Number of Billable Pages: Pages 509-514. Total Number of Pages: 6. THIS DOCKET ENTRY AND PDF DOCUMENT ARE SEALED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT AND/OR LEGAL AUTHORITY GOVERNING SEALED FILINGS. ACCESS IS LIMITED ONLY TO THE COURT. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS) Modified on 9/19/2012 to restrict pursuant to Order 515 in case 8:09cv456 (AOA).
August 20, 2012 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: Pages 447-508. Total Number of Pages: 62. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume II of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 17, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 235. Total Number of Pages: 235. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 208 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume I of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 16, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 211. Total Number of Pages: 211. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER - The Unopposed Motion for Permission to Restrict (filing no. 513) is granted. As provided below, the Unopposed Motion to Redact (filing no. 514) is granted in part and otherwise, to wit: As of approximately 2:21 P.M. on July 23, 2012, the digital audio recording for the morning session of July 18, 2012 of the non jury trial has been restricted so that it may only be accessed by counsel of record and case participants. The transcriber has been notified when preparing the transcript to file the bench conference separately as a restricted document. The motion is otherwise denied. This order pertains to Case Nos. 4:10CV3005 and 4:09CV3266. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 20, 2012 Filing 206 Unopposed RESTRICTED MOTION regarding Unopposed MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (205 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 198 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 513 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K, Intervenor Parties John Doe 21-23, John Doe 21-23.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 20, 2012 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K, Intervenor Parties John Doe 21-23, John Doe 21-23.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 LETTER BY CLERK that a CD was sent to Rogene Schroder for transcription regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Non-Jury Trial - Ended,,,, (506 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 506 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Non-Jury Trial - Began,,, (498 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Non-Jury Trial Held,, (502 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). Transcript ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(SCR, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER BY CLERK that a CD was sent to Rogene Schroder for transcription regarding Non-Jury Trial - Began,,, 189 , Non-Jury Trial Held,, 193 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Non-Jury Trial - Ended,,,, 197 . Transcript ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (SCR, )
July 19, 2012 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Post, Ryan)
July 18, 2012 Filing 201 EXHIBIT LIST from Non-Jury Trial held held on July 16, 2012 - July 18, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA) (Modified on 1/7/2014 to attach #1 Court Exhibit 1 per CCB) (JAB)
July 18, 2012 Filing 200 WITNESS LIST from non-jury trial held On July 16, 2012 - July 18, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 199 AUDIO FILE (24.8 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Afternoon Session) 197 held on July 18, 2012 at 1:33 PM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 198 AUDIO FILE (39.8 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Morning Session) 197 held on July 18, 2012 at 9:07 AM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA) Modified on 7/23/2012 to restrict per RGK chambers (AOA).
July 18, 2012 Filing 197 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/18/2012 in Lincoln. Evidence by Plaintiff. Defendant's motion for dismissal pursuant to Rule 50 is denied. Evidence by Defendant. Non-Jury Trial concluded. Matter submitted. Written Order forthcoming. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputy: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 9:07 AM; Time Stop: 3:07 PM; Time in Court: 3 Hours 44 Minutes. (AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 196 MOTION to Dismiss Parties filed by Attorneys Kevin L. Griess and Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants State of Nebraska, et al. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ (TEL)
July 18, 2012 Filing 195 AUDIO FILE (42.9 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Afternoon hearing) 193 held on July 17, 2012 at 1:40 PM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 194 AUDIO FILE (48.9 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Morning Session) 193 held on July 17, 2012 at 8:06 AM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 17, 2012 Filing 193 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/17/2012 in Lincoln. Evidence by Plaintiff and Defendant. Non-Jury Trial not concluded, continued to 9:00 a.m. on July 18, 2012 in Courtroom 2 Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputy: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 8:06 AM; Time Stop: 4:56 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hours 52 Minutes. (AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 192 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT (STIPULATION) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn, Stuart J. Dornan. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 191 AUDIO FILE (61.5 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Afternoon Session) 189 held on July 16, 2012 at 1:02 p.m. before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 190 AUDIO FILE (22.9 MB) regarding Non-Jury Trial (Morning Session) 189 held on July 16, 2012 at 10:46 a.m. before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 189 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/16/2012 in Lincoln. Opening Statements. Evidence by Plaintiff and Defendant. Non-Jury Trial not concluded, continued to 8:00 a.m. on July 17, 2012 in Courtroom 2 Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputies: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 10:46 AM; Time Stop: 5:02 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hours 7 Minutes. (AOA) Modified on 7/17/2012 to change date (AOA).
July 9, 2012 Filing 188 BRIEF (Trial Brief) and Proposed Findings of Fact by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 9, 2012 Filing 187 BRIEF Pretrial by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 186 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 185 EXHIBIT LIST by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 4 days; Non-Jury Trial set for 7/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 2, 2012 Filing 182 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re Restricted Document,, (479 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 171 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 163 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ), Restricted Document,, (172 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 164 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 480 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. The attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 29, 2012 Filing 183 AUDIO FILE (24.1 MB) regarding Motion Hearing 176 held on 6/29/2012 at 1:58 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TEL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 181 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Defendant's counsel from hearing held on 6/29/12. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TEXT ORDER granting #170 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Plaintiffs Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline, 455 , Defendants Motion for Sanctions, 461 , and Defendants Motions to Quash, [464, 466, 468, 469, 470, 474 and 481]. The deadline for filing any objections to the orders entered herein is expedited, and any objections shall be filed on or before July 5, 2012.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER granting (478) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Filing 177 EXHIBIT LIST from hearing held on 6/29/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ (TEL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 176 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart in Lincoln on 6/29/2012. Motion Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline 455 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Parties 459 ; Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 461 ; and Defendant's Motions to Quash 464 466 468 469 470 474 481 . Magistrate Judge Zwart will recommend to District Judge Richard G. Kopf that the unopposed Motion to Dismiss Parties Does 1 and 22 459 be granted. Written Findings and Recommendation to issue. Argument on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 461 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 461 is denied. The duplicate filings of Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (filings 153 in 4:09cv3266 and 145 in 4:10cv3005) are hereby withdrawn. Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline 455 . Response by Defendant. Matter submitted. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline 455 is denied. Argument on Defendant's Motions to Quash 464 474 481 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motions to Quash 464 474 481 are sustained. Argument on Defendant's Motions to Quash 466 468 469 470 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motions to Quash 466 468 469 470 are sustained. Magistrate rulings subject to appeal. Expedited Objection deadline. Clerk to transcribe hearing in an expedited matter at parties' request. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist and Thomas J. Monaghan. Appearance for Defendants: Katherine J. Spohn and James D. Smith. Courtroom Deputy: Troy E. Lieberth; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 1:58 PM; Time Stop: 3:25 PM; Time in Court: 1 Hour 27 Minutes. (TEL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 175 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms(481 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 165 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 173 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin Griess, #2 Exhibit Subpoena of John of Harms)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 174 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms(481 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 165 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 173 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 173 MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 172 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Exhibits and Exhibits regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits(170 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 478 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1-3)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 171 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Brief regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits(170 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 478 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 170 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 169 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re Index,,,, (473 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. The attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 28, 2012 Filing 168 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(474 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 166 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 158 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 167 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(474 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 166 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 158 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 166 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 165 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(158 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 150 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 466 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(153 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 161 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 469 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(152 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 160 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 468 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(470 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 154 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(464 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 156 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine J. Spohn, #2 Exhibit Subpoena of Peter Pirsch, #3 Exhibit Subpoena of Jon Bruning, #4 Exhibit Subpoena of David Cookson, #5 Exhibit Subpoena of John Freudenberg, #6 Exhibit Subpoena of Corey O'Brien)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER SETTING HEARING:1) On or before 12:00 p.m. (noon) on June 28, 2012, the defendant shall file an index of evidence with copies of the subpoenas underlying their motions to quash;2) On or before 12:00 p.m. (noon) on June 29, 2012, the plaintiffs shall file any written response to the defendants" motions to quash;3) An oral argument on all pending motions in this case (Plaintiffs' motion to extend the deposition deadline; Defendants' motion for sanctions; Defendants' motions to quash) will be held on June 29, 2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. In Court Hearing set for Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 27, 2012 Filing 163 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(153 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 469 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 161 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(152 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 160 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 468 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(470 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 154 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Parties Dave Cookson, John Freudenberg, Corey O'Brien.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 162 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Corey O'Brien.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 161 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Freudenberg.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 160 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Dave Cookson.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 159 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(158 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 150 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 466 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 158 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 157 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(156 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 464 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Pete Pirsch.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 156 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Pete Pirsch.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 155 INDEX in support of MOTION for Sanctions (145 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 154 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Sanctions (145 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 153 MOTION for Sanctions by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 152 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TEXT ORDER. This case is scheduled to be tried in less than a month. Accordingly, defendants' response to the plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline(455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) shall be filed on or before June 26, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 21, 2012 Filing 150 INDEX in support of MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Brief, (149 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 456 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 141 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 21, 2012 Filing 149 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 21, 2012 Filing 148 MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 15, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE of Serving Documents by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the Magistrate Judges Memorandum and Order (filing 447 in Case No. 8:09CV456) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained; Defendants statement of objections to the aforesaid memorandum and order (filing in 448 Case No. 8:09CV456) is denied; and the stay of the Magistrate Judges order is lifted and Defendants shall produce all non-privileged documents on or before June 15, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (450) Motion to Stay in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting (142) Motion to Stay in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; granting (135) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. The deadline for disclosing materials in accordance with this courts order dated May 14, 2012 is stayed pending further order of the court. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
May 24, 2012 Filing 144 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re Motion to Stay, #142 , Brief, #143 , Brief, #141 and Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order, #140 by Deputy Clerk. This document does not comply with NECivR 11.1(a) regarding signatures or The attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings.(MKR)
May 23, 2012 Filing 143 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER(135 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 23, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION to Stay OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 23, 2012 Filing 141 BRIEF in support of Statement, (133 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 23, 2012 Filing 140 STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine) Modified on 5/23/2012 to change event from statement to objection to magistrate judge's order per conversation with Attorney General's office (CCB).
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order on Restricted Motion (442 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). On February 28, 2012 the undersigned ordered Defendants to submit certain documents for an in camera review to determine whether the documents were shielded from discovery by the attorney/client privilege and/or the deliberative process privilege. After review, IT IS ORDERED: 1) Documents Nos. 1a, 1b, 2 & 3 of Exhibit C are protected by the deliberative process privilege and shall not be produced. 2) All of the remaining documents listed on Defendants' privilege log shall beproduced to Plaintiffs on or before May 25, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 1, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David G. Post by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
March 16, 2012 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing Documents under Seal by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
March 9, 2012 Filing 135 NOTICE of Serving Documents by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (425) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting in part and denying in part (118) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ and granting in part and denying in part (112) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. With respect to the documents numbered 22, 23, 24, & 25 on Filing No. 425-3, Ex. B, Plaintiffs' motion to compel (filing no. 425 ) is granted. Defendants shall produce those documents to Plaintiffs by March 9, 2012. Defendants shall file the remaining documents identified in Filing Nos. 425-3, Exs. B and C under seal by March 16, 2012 in order for the undersigned to conduct an in camera review and determine if the claimed privileges apply. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
February 20, 2012 Filing 133 REPLY BRIEF in support of Brief,, (132 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 125 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 438 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDER(112 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 13, 2012 Filing 132 BRIEF in opposition to RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDER(118 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 112 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 425 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties, and with their agreement, 4-day Bench Trial continued to 7/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference continued to 7/3/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB) Modified on 2/14/2012 to reflect trial is to the bench. (JAB)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The Court will e-mail call-in telephone information to all counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
January 31, 2012 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe K by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe J by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 127 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe I by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe H by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe G by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe F by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe E by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe A by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER granting #117 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Filing #118 shall remain filed under restricted access. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ) Modified on 1/30/2012 to change under seal to under restriction per Judge Zwart's chambers. (JAB)
January 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TEXT ORDER granting (424) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 27, 2012 Filing 119 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING BRIEF AND INDEX ATTACHED TO MOTION regarding Restricted Motion,, #118 by Deputy Clerk. Briefs and Indexes shall be electronically filed as a separate document using the brief or index event. The brief and index must identify the document to which it relates. This notice is for your information for future filings.(MKR)
January 26, 2012 Filing 118 RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A-E)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 26, 2012 Filing 117 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 11, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 35 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 35 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 36 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 34 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 32 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 30 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 29 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 25 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 24 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 20 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 19 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 15 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (404) Motion to Compel in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (99) Motion to Compel in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (93) Motion to Compel in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Plaintiffs request for a protective order limiting discovery is granted under the terms set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 26, 2011 Filing 103 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel(93 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 99 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs responses to the defendants motions to compel shall be filed on or before September 26, 2011. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
September 13, 2011 Filing 101 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel(404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 13, 2011 Filing 100 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel(404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 3, #2 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 6, #3 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 7, #4 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 11, #5 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 12, #6 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 16, #7 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 17, #8 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 21, #9 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 23, #10 Exhibit Deposition Transcript Doe 3, #11 Exhibit Deposition Transcript Doe 12)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 13, 2011 Filing 99 MOTION to Compel by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 401 Motion for Protective Order in Lead Case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ and in Member Cases: 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, (filing no. 96) and 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ (filing no. 90).Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
August 19, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 19, 2011 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Judge Zwart's chambers will provide conferencing instructions.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Judge Zwart's chambers will email conferencing instructions to counsel. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
July 8, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the parties' supplemental Joint [396) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting #91 Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting #85 Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The parties are hereby ordered to comply with the terms and conditions of their Supplemental Joint Stipulation and Protective Order #91 , 396 and #85 . Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
June 17, 2011 Filing 91 Joint STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Magistrate Judges memorandum and order (filing 384 in Case No. 8:09CV456) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained; The defendant's objection to and appeal from the Magistrate Judge's memorandum and order 386 in Case No. 8:09cv456) is denied. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
May 24, 2011 Filing 89 REPLY BRIEF in support of OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(75 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 17, 2011 Filing 88 BRIEF in opposition to OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(386 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 75 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 81 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER adopting (391) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; adopting (86) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; adopting (80) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 6, 2011 Filing 86 Joint STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting ( 388 ) Motion to Stay in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (83) Motion to Stay in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (77) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Defendants' motion to stay discovery is granted pending the resolution of Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order, (filing no. 386 ) with respect to the subset of documents as set out in this order. Defendants' motion to stay is denied to the extent it seeks to stay discovery involving any documents not included in the above-described subset. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case,8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
May 3, 2011 Filing 84 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay of Magistrate Judge's Order(388 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 83 MOTION to Stay of Magistrate Judge's Order by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 82 BRIEF in support of OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(386 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 81 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Plaintiffs motion to compel, (filing no. 374 ), is granted in part and denied in part as set forth within the order. The defendants unopposed motions to continue, (filing no. 383 ), are granted. The pretrial conference and trial of the above-captioned cases are continued pending further order of the court. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
April 6, 2011 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
March 18, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Responses by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
March 1, 2011 Filing 77 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery(71 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 374 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ), Index,, (375 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 66 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 72 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ), Brief, (74 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 68 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 377 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER granting (378) Motion for Leave in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (75) Motion for Leave in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (69) Motion for Leave in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to compel shall be filed on or before March 1,2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
February 17, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 14, 2011 Filing 74 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery(65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
January 28, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE of Serving Expert Report by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 28, 2011 Filing 72 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery(71 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 374 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 28, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - The defendants unopposed amended motions to extend the expert witnessdeadline, (8:09-cv-00456, filing no. 372 ; 4:09-cv-03266, filing no. 69; and4:10-cv-03005, filing no. 63) are granted, and a. The defendants expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to January 28, 2011. b. The plaintiffs deadline for filing of any motion to exclude expert testimony on Daubert and related grounds is extended to February 11, 2011. The defendants motions to extend the expert witness deadline, (8:09-cv-00456, filing no. 371 ; 4:09-cv-03266, filing no. 68; and 4:10-cv-03005, filing no. 62) are denied as moot. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
January 21, 2011 Filing 69 Amended MOTION to Extend (Unopposed) Unopposed MOTION to Extend(371 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 14, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER granting (368) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ;Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Defendants' deadline to serve responses to Plaintiffs interrogatories and requests for production of documents is extended to January 21, 2011 and the deadline for Defendants to file any Motion to Compel is extended to January 28, 2011.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 11, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 23, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 17, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure and Notice of Serving Expert Report by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER granting (363) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; and the related motions in Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Plaintiffs' expert report shall be served on or before December 17, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
December 9, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
December 8, 2010 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to File an Expert Report Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case, (57 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 360 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 16, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
October 29, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 1/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS) Modified on 9/20/2010 to correct filed date(MKR).
September 15, 2010 Filing 56 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 15, 2010 Filing 55 Joint STIPULATION regarding Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Objection,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
August 18, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance (Amended) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 18, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING PACKET - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/15/2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Defendants original motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing 317, Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing #23 , Case No. 4:10CV3004 filing 22, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 17) is denied without prejudice, as moot. Defendants amended motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing 336, Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing #35 , Case No. 4:10CV3004 filing 34, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 29) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth within the order. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing 344, Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing #41 , Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 35) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth within the order. Defendants objections to Plaintiffs exhibits (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing 349, Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing ]46], Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 40) are denied without prejudice. Within 30 days, the parties shall provide me with a stipulation designating those Plaintiffs who fit within this categorysex offenders who were not on probation, parole or court-monitored supervision as of January 1, 2010 together with the date when the offender was no longer under criminal justice supervision. If, for some reason, the parties cannot reach agreement, they shall arrange a telephone conference with me by contacting my judicial assistant. These cases are referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for further progression, as appropriate. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C) Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
June 11, 2010 Filing 50 INDEX in support of Reply Brief,, (352 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 49 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 43 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) and Objection to Defendants' Brief in Support of Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Skaggs v. NSP BOE, #2 Exhibit #2 - Skaggs v. NSP Order, #3 Exhibit #3 - Legislative Committee Statement)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 11, 2010 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (48 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 351 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 42 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) and Objection to Defendants' Brief in Support of Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
May 28, 2010 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(29 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 35 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 28, 2010 Filing 47 BRIEF in support of OBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(40 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 28, 2010 Filing 46 OBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER granting (347) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ. Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for SummaryJudgment on or by May 28, 2010, and Plaintiffs Reply shall be filed on or by June 11, 2010. References to the Complaint (Filing 1) in Plaintiffs Brief in Support of their Objection to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 345), are deemed to refer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Filing 329). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ, )
May 6, 2010 Filing 44 STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
April 30, 2010 Filing 43 INDEX in support of Brief, (36 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 345 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 42 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) in Support of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Part 1 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, #2 Exhibit #1 - Part 2 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, #3 Exhibit #2 Skaggs v. NSP Brief, #4 Exhibit #3 Skaggs v. NSP Order, #5 Exhibit #4 Journal Star Article, #6 Exhibit #5 NSP SOR Home Page, #7 Exhibit #6 NSP SOR Search Page, #8 Exhibit #7 Notification of Responsibilities, #9 Exhibit #8 Affidavit of Steven Donnelly, #10 Exhibit #9 Declaration of John Doe, #11 Exhibit #10 - #16 Second Declarations of Does 2, 7, 12, 15, 22, 28 and 36, #12 Exhibit #17 Legislature Committee Statement)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 30, 2010 Filing 42 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 30, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting (341) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:09-cv-00456. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (331) Motion for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ (filing (43) in case 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ; filing (32) in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; filing (26) in case 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ; filing (31) in case 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ; filing(26) in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 38 BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) Amended by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 37 INDEX in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #4 Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #5 Exhibit 1a to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #6 Exhibit 1b to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #7 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #8 Affidavit of Leslie Levy)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 36 BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 35 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
March 29, 2010 Filing 34 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court(331 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
March 15, 2010 Filing 33 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court(26 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Dornan, Stuart)
March 15, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Dornan, Stuart)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (320) Motion to Stay; granting (325) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting (36) Motion to Stay; granting (41) Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ; granting (26) Motion to Stay; granting (30) Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; granting (19) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ; granting (29) Stipulation; granting (25) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ; granting (20) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Parties to be added and their Declarations shall be filed on or before March 15, 2010. Any Motion for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court shall be filed by March 15, 2010. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or their own Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and supporting briefs by May 1,2010. The deadline for filing the parties Rule 26(f) Report, previously set for March 5, 2010, is continued until thirty days following the courts ruling on defendants' motions for summary judgment. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
March 1, 2010 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION regarding MOTION to Stay Discovery(320 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that a telephonic conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on 3/1/2010 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for the defendants shall place the call as ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. (SED)
February 26, 2010 Filing 28 TEXT NOTICE OF INDEX OF EVIDENCE (23 in 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 18 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 24 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 17 in 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ, 318 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 34 in 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. Pursuant to NECivR 7.0.1(a)(2) and (b)(2), evidence in support of a motion or brief shall be identified on an electronically-filed index of evidence. The index of evidence must identify the motion or brief to which it relates. Attachments to the index must be described using the System-generated prompt box. This notice is for your information for future filings.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB) Modified on 2/26/2010 to reflect attachments to the brief are a comparison requested by the Judge in order #50 , not evidence. (JAB)
February 25, 2010 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to sallen@megavision.com regarding filings 317 , 318 , 319 and 320 in this case and the same documents in consolidated cases. E-mail not remailed, attorney is no longer with the Platte County Attorney's Office. New Platte County Attorney will file substitution of counsel. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB)
February 25, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 25 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment(317 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #4 Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #5 Exhibit 1a to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #6 Exhibit 1b to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #7 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #8 Affidavit of Leslie Levy)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 24 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment(317 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 8, 2010 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) regarding: Notice of Removal, #1 Exhibit 1 by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma. (Spohn, Katherine)
February 5, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Alex Hayes, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
January 29, 2010 Filing 20 LETTER BY CLERK that a CD was sent to Sue DeVetter for transcription regarding Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion Hearing, (76 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 76 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). Transcript ordered by Stuart J. Dornan. THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(SLP)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before February 26, 2010, counsel for the parties in all six cases shall confer, either in person, telephonically, or by facsimile or electronic mail, to jointly complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report. If an initial planning conference is not warranted and the parties can agree on all the deadlines identified in the Rule 26(f) Report, the Report shall be completed and filed on or before March 5, 2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 22, 2010 Filing 19 Copy of ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER from the Nebraska Supreme Court and Nebraska Court of Appeals regarding case In re Appl for Exercise of Administrative Authority of Chief Justice, case number S-33-100002. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - These six cases are consolidated for all purposes including trial and discovery. Counsel and the Clerk are ordered to proceed as follows when filing documents and otherwise processing these cases. John Doe, et al., v. State of Nebraska, et al., Case No. 8:09CV456 (D. Neb. 2009) is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." The other five cases are each designated as a "Member Case". The motions to consolidate (filings No. 82 and 88 in 8:09CV456; filing 11 in 4:09CV3258; filing #2 in 4:09CV3266) are granted as provided herein but otherwise denied. By agreement of the parties, any demand for a jury is withdrawn. The consolidated cases are designated as non- jury cases. By agreement of the parties, all plaintiffs shall have the benefit of the preliminary injunction previously issued in the "Lead Case." This matter is referred to Judge Zwart for further progression and the issuance of scheduling packet tailored to the needs of the consolidated cases. Each of the defendants is given until February 8, 2010 to answer or further plead. The motion for extension of time (filing #12 in 4:09CV3266) is granted as provided herein and otherwise denied. The motion to intervene and related motion to use fictitious names (filings 70 and 71 in 8:09CV456) are denied without prejudice because no proposed pleading was filed as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(c). The motions to withdraw as attorneys (filings 94 and 304 in 8:09CV456) are granted. The motion to remand (filing #8 in 4:09CV3266) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
January 21, 2010 Filing 16 AUDIO FILE (12.5 MB) regarding Status Conference 15 held on 01/21/10 at 8:30 a.m. before District Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
January 21, 2010 Filing 15 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart in Lincoln on 1/21/2010. Status Conference Hearing held by telephone in Courtroom No. 1. Order forthcoming. Appearance for Plaintiffs: Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan, Joshua Weir, and Rodney Dahlquist, Jr.; State Defendants: David Cookson, Katherine Spahn; Douglas County Defendants: Jeffrey Lux; Time Commenced: 8:30 a.m. Time Concluded: 9:22 a.m. (CCB)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER - Regarding Magistrate Judge Zwart's Docket (General Order 2010-01). All cases previously assigned to District Judge Richard G. Kopf for pretrial management are herewith reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zwart. Magistrate Judge Zwart shall be paired with Judges Kopf and Urbom for the management of civil and criminal cases on Judges Kopf and Urbom's dockets. The Clerk of the Court shall provide notice of this order to counsel or parties in all cases which are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zwart and for which there are currently matters pending. Notice need not be given in closed cases for which there are no matters pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. NOTE: The notice of electronic filing attached to this entry reflects multiple case numbers and recipients.(TCL )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Counsel shall review the attachment listing all pending motions in these cases. Counsel shall be prepared to state their positions with respect to the pending motions and with respect to further progression of these cases. (Attachments: #1 Pending Motions)Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
January 15, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma.(Spohn, Katherine)
January 12, 2010 Filing 11 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #8 by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma.(Spohn, Katherine)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In 8:09CV456, the State of Nebraska filed a notice advising me that "duplicative actions [have been] filed in State Courts". I herewith request that the courts of the State of Nebraska refrain from issuing any orders enjoining Nebraska's Sex Offender Registration Act and related legislative bills while my cases are pending. I desperately hope to avoid a dispute with the state courts, but if push comes to shove and Nebraska files an appropriate motion, I may step in and enjoin state judges from taking any further action in these matters. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the State of Nebraska shall provide a copy of this memorandum and order to any state court judge considering whether to enjoin enforcement of the Nebraska Sex Offender Registration Act and LB 97 and LB 285. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding phone calls with Judges Arterburn and Burns. No substantive legal discussions were held between the aforementioned judges and me. I would characterize the calls from these judges as courtesy calls. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
December 30, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Joshua W. Weir on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe.(Weir, Joshua)
December 30, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joshua W. Weir on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Weir, Joshua)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Except as provided below, the request for a preliminary injunction is denied. Defendants are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing the following statutes against persons who have been convicted of sex offenses but who have completed their criminal sentences and who are not on probation, parole, or court-ordered supervision, to wit: (1) Neb. Rev. Stat. 29-4006(2) (West, Operative January 1, 2010) (requiring consent to search and installation of monitoring hardware and software) and (2) Neb. Rev. Stat. 28-322.05 (West, Operative January 1, 2010) (making it a crime to use Internet social networking sites accessible by minors by a person required to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act). Since a bond will be posted in 8:09CV456, counsel for the Plaintiff in this case is the same as counsel for the Plaintiffs in 8:09CV456, and it is likely that these two cases will be consolidated, no bond will be required in this case at this time. However, if the defendants wish to object to the lack of a bond, they may file a motion for reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 29, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - Regarding Lincoln Magistrate Docket. Pursuant to the retirement of Magistrate Judge David L. Piester on August 1, 2009, all civil and criminal cases previously assigned to Judge Piester are reassigned to District Judge Richard G. Kopf. Judge Kopf will handle pretrial management in new civil and criminal cases assigned to Judges Kopf and Urbom in accordance with NEGenR 1.4(a)(2) and NECivR 72.1 until a new magistrate judge is appointed. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
December 28, 2009 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Richard G. Kopf and Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE) assigned. (JAB)
December 28, 2009 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 28, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against John Doe from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number Doc. 1102 No. 678 with attached state court pleadings, (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0867-1681320) by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Bryan Tuma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cookson, David) Modified on 12/29/2009 to add payment information (PCV, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Nebraska State Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jason E. Troia
Represented By: Joshua W. Weir
Represented By: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart J. Dornan
Represented By: Thomas J. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Patrol
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col. Bryan Tuma
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Kleine
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lux
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy F. Dunning
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lux
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Hayes
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Thomas O. Mumgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Senator Pete Pirsch
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dave Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Freudenberg
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Corey O'Brien
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Senator Scott Lautenbaugh
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Senator John Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?