Castonguay v. Taff et al
Case Number: 4:2010cv03013
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 30 ) is denied. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 14 the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 9 filed by Paul Castonguay, Sr. Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party, plaintiff's institution, and provided to the Court of Appeals)(JAB)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice. A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the Clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding months income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copy mailed to institution as directed)(ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castonguay v. Taff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?