October 17, 2011 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting 146 Stipulation for Dismissal - The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
144
SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the m agistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's September 12, 2011 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 10/6/2011. Termed 9/12/2011 non-jury trial date. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
143
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's memorandum and order (filing 116 ) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained; and Plaintiff's statement of objections to, or appeal from, the Magistrate Judges order (filing 131 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
142
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion in limine to exclude the expert testimony of Garth Ashpaugh (filing 123 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion at trial. Plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude the expert testimony of Daniel J. Caldwell and Jeffrey L. Pursley (filing 126 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion at trial. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
119
ORDER granting 118 Motion for Leave. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
August 1, 2011 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration. Paragraphs 1 through 4 of the courts prior order, 105 , remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting 104 plaintiff's oral motion for late disclosure of an additional expert, with scheduling deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
85
ORDER granting 83 Motion to Extend; Plaintiff shall have until April 1, 2011, to file a reply regarding 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 84 Motion for Leave is granted; Plaintiff shall have until April 1, 2011, to file a sur-reply brief regarding 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing
69
ORDER granting 68 Motion to set status conference. A telephonic status conference is set for February 15, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
67
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing
65
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss 63 is granted; Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc., and Windstream Corporation are dismissed from the action without prejudice. Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation 61 , the motions to dismiss filed by Defendants Winstream Communications, Inc. 51 and Windstream Corporation 54 are withdrawn. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 59 that Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time. Plaintiff shall have until November 5, 2010, to respond to motions to dismiss filed by Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. 51 and Windstream Corporation 54 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAE)
|
August 18, 2010 |
Filing
49
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 48 Motion to Amend; The pretrial conference and jury trial remain scheduled for March 24, 2011 andApril 4, 2011, respectively. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendants motion to strike the plaintiffs demand for a jury trial 17 is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The plaintiffs amended motion to amend, (filing no. 21 ), is granted in part and denied in part as follows: a. The motion is denied as to the addition of proposed defendants Windstream Midwest, Inc, Windstream Holding of Midwes t, Inc., and Windstream Systems of the Midwest, Inc. b. The plaintiff is granted leave to add proposed defendants Windstream Corporation and Windstream Communications, Inc. The plaintiffs motion to amend, (filing no. 19 ), is denied as moot. The plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from today to file an amended complaint in compliance with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
26
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend ; The deadline for Windstream to move to amend its answer is extended to 14 days after a denial of the Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint or, in the event that the Plaintiffs motion is granted, 14 days after Windstream answers the Plaintiffs amended complaint. The deadline for mandatory disclosures is extended to July 15, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
|