Ajamu v. Douglas County District Court et al
Plaintiff: |
Ojore Mulumba Ajamu, VII |
Defendant: |
City of Omaha, Douglas County Correctional Center, Douglas County District Court and Omaha Police Department |
NDCS: |
Lincoln Regional Center |
Case Number: |
4:2010cv03220 |
Filed: |
November 15, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of the court is directed to file Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 15 as a new case. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice; All pending motions are denied as moot; A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; and The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Pl aintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit and the Form AO241, Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms as directed)(ADB, )
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The Clerk of the court shall serve a copy of th is order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiffs current institution. Plaintiff shall continue to keep the court informed of his current address at all times.Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(copy mailed to plaintiff's institution)(ADB, )
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to either tender the $350 filing fee or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis and an affidavit of poverty in support thereof on or before January 3, 2011. Failure to comply with this Memorandu m and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed t o set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 3, 2011: deadline for tendering filing fee or submitting in forma pauperis request and affidavit. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?