Thorton v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Co.
Plaintiff: James Thornton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Nebraska Department of Labor
Case Number: 4:2010cv03243
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting 72 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Continue. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in North Platte Courtroom, Federal Bldg, US Post Office & Courthouse, 300 E 3rd St, North Platte, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2012 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Status Conference set for 3/1/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Joint Motion for Protective Order 35 . The Protective Order shall be entered pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The undersigned's order (filing no. 22 ) quashing the Subpoena Duces Tecum served by Defendant on the Nebraska Department of Labor is withdrawn and the Nebraska Department of Labors motion to quash (filing no. 19 ) is denied. Defendant's unopposed motion to compel (filing no. 23 ) is granted. The Nebraska Department of Labor shall comply with the subpoena issued by Defendant within 7 days of the date of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Summons Returned Executed 7 has been reviewed and the Court finds the Motion to be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorton v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Todd A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Labor
Represented By: John H. Albin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thornton
Represented By: Jonathan V. Rehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?