Conseco Life Insurance Company v. Funke et al
Plaintiff: |
Conseco Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Linda B. Funke and Jo Ann G. Funke |
Cross Defendant: |
Linda B. Funke, Jo Ann G. Funke and Conseco Life Insurance Company |
Cross Claimant: |
Linda B. Funke and Jo Ann G. Funke |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv03047 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2012 |
Filing
39
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' joint motion for stipulated settlement (filing 36 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to release one half of the remaining funds deposited with the court on April 1, 2011, together with one half of any accrued interest, to Jo Ann G. Funke. The Clerk of the court is directed to release one half of the remaining funds deposited with the court on April 1, 2011, together with one half of any accrued interest, to Linda B. Funke. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy given to Finance)(AOA)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 36 Defendants' Joint Motion for Settlement. The Clerk of the court is directed to release one half of the remaining funds deposited with the court on April 1, 2011, together with one half of any accrued interest, to each Jo Ann G. Funk and Linda B. Funke. All claims that were brought or could have been brought are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy to Finance)(JAB)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. On or before June 13, 2012, the defendants shall file their motion, with attached stipulation, for the distribution of funds currently held for this case by the Clerk of the Court.The trial of this case, previously set for June 4, 2012, is cancelled.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
32
ORDER - Conseco Life's motion for disbursement of attorney's fees and costscharged against interpleader funds (filing 31 ) is granted. In accordance with the judgment entered on August 24, 2011, the Clerk of the Court is directed to release to Conseco Life $896.50 from the funds that were deposited with the court on April 1, 2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy to Finance Department)(AOA)
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and costs 22 is granted. Final judgment shall be entered in plaintiff's favor and there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Judgment shall be entered by separate document dismissing plaintiff from this matter and providing that plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $896.50, which shall be charged against the interpleader funds. The entry of judgment in favor of plaintiff does not close this case. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for further progression. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
|
June 4, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER regarding Scheduling Packet, 16 . The court's scheduling packet order, 16 , is set aside pending a ruling on filing no. 17 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?