SaLazar v. Mental Health Board et al
Plaintiff: |
Ambrosio SaLazar, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Mary Paine, Stephen O'Neil, Stephanie Bruhn, Michael Gett, Carl K. Hart, Jr., John Kroll, Mental Health Board, Nebraska State Penitentiary, Marsha L. Nelson, Daryl Stephenson, State of Nebraska and Norfolk Regional Center |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv03048 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 18 - Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.44 by October 26, 2011, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those i nstallments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (Copy mailed to USCA-Eighth Circuit) (Copy mailed to Inga Hookstra, Accounting/Finance Manager, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Central Office Accounting, PO Box 94661, Lincoln, NE 68508.) (TEL)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because the Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order and the court's May 25, 2011, Memorandum and Order. All pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until June 24, 2011, to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief can be granted against Defendants, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 9 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 6 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.04 by June 6, 2011, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response t o a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 6, 2011: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and as directed) (AOA)
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before April 29, 2011. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this m atter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: April 29, 2011: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to Pro Se party) (Form AO240 mailed as directed) (TEL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?