Pettigrew v. Cherry County School District No. 16-0006
Plaintiff: Bud Pettigrew
Defendant: Cherry County School District No. 16-0006 and Valentine Community Schools
Case Number: 4:2011cv03166
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - With respect to Case No. 4:11CV3166, that: Filing 46 , Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, is denied; Filings 65 and 66 , Defendants motion for summary judgment, are denied; Filing 104 , Plaintiffs motion to strike De fendants motion for summary judgment, is denied; and Filing 107 , Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendants evidence, is denied. With respect to Case No. 4:12CV3159, that: Filing 47 , Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, is denied; Filing 75 , Plaintiffs motion for leave to file restricted access documents, is granted;. Filing 78 , Defendants motion for summary judgment, is denied; and Filing 84 , Defendants motion for leave to file restricted access documents, is granted. Member Cases: 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Defendant's statement of objections to (98) Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order and (99) Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order in case 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ and denying (39) Order on Appeal to Magistr ate Judge Order and (40) Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order in case 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ. The Magistrate Judges order entered on October 15, 2012 (filing 87 ), is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Plaintiffs demands for a trial by jury in Case Nos. 4:11CV3166 and 4:12CV3159 are stricken; all claims shall be tried to the court sitting without a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel deposition testimony; denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for a credibility hearing; denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the defendant's motion for summary judgment; denying 128 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the defendant's amended index of evidence on the plaintiff's motion for a credibility hearing; denying 130 Defendant's Motion to Strike the plaintiff's reply brief and inde x of evidence in support of the plaintiff's motion to compel; and granting 133 Motion to allow the plaintiff to file reply briefs and evidence offered in support of his motion to compel and motion for credibility hearing out of time. The plaintiff's response to the defendants motion for summary judgment (4:11cv3166, Filing No. 66), shall be filed on or before January 28, 2013. Any reply thereto shall be filed on or before February 7, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER sustaining (84) Objection in case 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ; filing 23, in case 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding deadline for full submission on the OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Subpoena, ( 84 in 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ, 23 in 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ) and setting briefing and dispositive motion filing deadlines. Member Cases: 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PROTECTION ORDER granting stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (14) defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's jury demand in case 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ. Member Cases: 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Consolidating cases. The following cases are consolidated for all stages of the case prior to appeal, including trial: 4-11-cv-03166: Pettigrew v. Cherry County School District No. 16-0006 is hereby designated as the "Le ad Case," and 4-12-cv-03159: Pettigrew v. Cherry County School District No. 16-0006 a/k/a Valentine Community Schools and f/k/a Valentine Rural High School is designated as a "Member Case." Notices of Electronic Filing to be regenerated. Member Cases: 4:11-cv-03166-RGK-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03159-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 55 , the defendant's objection and granting 53 plaintiff's motion to set for trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - Pursuant to the Memorandum and Ordered entered on September 6, 2012, case No. 4:12CV3159 is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. All deadlines in this case, including the defendant's deadline for responding to the plaintiff's pending summary judgment motion and its deadline for filing a summary judgment motion, are stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff's dispositive motion deadline is July 6, 2012; Defendant's deadline is July 20, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Motions to Change Place of Trial to the North Platte Division 16 and 23 . Upon balancing the interests of the litigants, their counsel, and the witnesses, the court finds that the trial should be moved to North Platte. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettigrew v. Cherry County School District No. 16-0006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry County School District No. 16-0006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentine Community Schools
Represented By: David P. Broderick
Represented By: Terrance O. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Pettigrew
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?