September 4, 2015 |
Filing
291
JUDGMENT: Upon the parties' 289 Stipulation for Dismissal and pursuant to the accompanying Consent Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to be responsible for its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
286
ORDER that the The Court has been advised that the parties in this case have settled their claims. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: This case is removed from the Court's trial calendar. The parties' pending evidentiary motions (filings 236 a nd 241) are denied as moot. On or before September 14, 2015, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of September 14, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
257
ORDER granting 256 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The Clerk of the Court is directed to edit the document restrictions for filing 252 to restrict access to case participants. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
207
ORDER granting 205 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.No further extensions will be granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
194
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion to Amend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
152
ORDER granting 151 Motion to Continue Jury Trial set for 7/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 01:00 PM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
141
ORDER - The motion to permit Colleen M. Melody to withdraw as counsel on behalf of the United States, (filing no. 140 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 125 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The deposition deadline is February 18, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
122
ORDER denying 103 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 115 Motion to Strike Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing
118
ORDER on Plaintiff's motion to strike and setting briefing schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting 107 Motion to Withdraw Mary J. Hahn as Attorney for plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' joint motion to continue, (Filing No. 101 ), is granted, and the progression order is modified as stated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL ) Modified on 4/1/2014 to correct typo(TCL ).
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on the record on January 10, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. to discuss: 1) Whether all reasonable attempts at settlement have been exhausted and a p rogression schedule to trial should be entered; and 2) If the parties believe further efforts at settlement are warranted: a. What representatives of the United States, by name and department, must be present at a settlement conference to fully addr ess the parties' ongoing issues; b. Whether those representatives commit to being present at a settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge if the conference is conducted in Washington, D.C. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1) Discovery is stayed pending the outcome of a settlement conference before the undersigned magistrate judge. 2) A telephonic conference to discuss the scheduling of the settlement conference will be held on September 3, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. (CDT). Counsel for the plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
87
STRICKEN - ORDER granting 85 Motion to Amend Progression Order. The jury trial is set for May 13, 2014 before U.S. Distruct Judge John M. Gerrard in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, NE at 9:00 a.m. The pretrial conf erence is scheduled for April 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Zwart and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial confer ence by WebEx.A telephonic conference with Magistrate Judge Zwart will be held on January 14, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the status of case progression and potentional settlement. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS) Modified on 7/17/2013 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 88 . (JAB)
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. 1) Third-party NACUA shall comply with the subpoena served on it by the plaintiff, but only to the extent the subpoena seeks documents, publications, or website materials that were circulated, distributed, or otherwise made readily available to the Defendants specifically, or to the NACUA membership as a whole, from January 1, 2007 until November 23, 2011.2) To the extent the subpoena requests any other documents or publications, the motion for protective order is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
April 4, 2013 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 73 Motion to Amend the Progression Order.Trial will commence before the Honorable John M. Gerrard, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on February 10, 2014. The Pretrial Conferenc e is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on January 28, 2014 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
January 18, 2013 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding: MOTION for Protective Order 62 . On or before February 4, 2013, the parties shall file their respective briefs on the issues identified in this memorandum and order. Any responsive briefs shall be filed on or before February 19, 2013. The motion for protective order will be deemed fully submitted on February 20, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER granting 56 Motion to Amend Progression Order. Trial will commence before the Honorable John M. Gerrard, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska at 9:00 a.m. on October 15, 2013. Pretrial Conference is schedule d before Judge Zwart on September 30, 2013 by WebEx. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. The telephonic status conference is set for January 15, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Zwart. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting 35 Stipulation regarding extending the expert disclosure deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER setting scheduling regarding summary judgment motions and briefing on the issue of whether the Fair Housing Act is applicable to university housing for college students. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
June 27, 2012 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial of this case is set to commence before the Honorable John M. Gerrard, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska at 9:00 a.m. on June 17, 2013, or as soon thereaf ter as the case may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at commencement of t rial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on June 6, 2013 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. To facilitate this conferencing method, the parties' proposed Pretrial Confe rence Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on June 5, 2013. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the p retrial conference by WebEx. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge remains set to be held on August 30, 2012 10:00 a.m. to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Stipulation regarding Electronic Discovery.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|