McGhee v. Houston
Petitioner: |
Eric McGhee |
Respondent: |
Robert Houston |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv03224 |
Filed: |
December 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 2, 2012 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment 8 is granted. Petitioner Eric McGhee's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. All other pending motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By March 5, 2012, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court recor ds in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 5, 2012: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for su mmary judgment. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 4, 2012: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and to respondents as ordered)(GJG)
|
December 20, 2011 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 3 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?