July 7, 2015 |
Filing
248
ORDER - The motion to permit Coady H. Pruett to withdraw as counsel on behalf of Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company, (Filing No. 247 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
218
ORDER granting Nancy Chung and Christopher M. Egleson to withdraw as counsel on behalf of Defendants Aventine Renewable Energy - Aurora West, LLC, and Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc. 216 and 217 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
171
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint. The plaintiff's proposed amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to its motion, shall be filed on or before November 10, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing
149
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding ESI discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties on the record:1) The defendant's motion to restrict, (Filing No. 138 ), is granted, and its responsive brief, (Filing No. 139 ), shall remain filed as a restricted access document.2) The plaintiff's Motion to Compel Aventine to Search for and Produce Email Records, (Filing No. 104 ), is granted under the terms discussed on the record, (Filing No. 146 ), and as set forth in this order. 3) A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on March 26, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. (noon), to discuss the parties' forensic expert selection. 4) The plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, (Filing No. 94 ), and its Objection to Ma gistrate Judge's Order, (Filing No. 95 ), are denied without prejudice to re-filing after the primary stage of discovery in this case is complete.5) The deadlines within the amended progression order, (Filing No. 91 ), including the trial and pretrial conference dates, are set aside pending further order of the court.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
January 26, 2014 |
Filing
116
PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding plant inspection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing
111
ORDER on motion for leave to inspect, 98 . Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2014 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 15, 2013 |
Filing
93
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1)Plaintiff's motion for leave to issue a subpoena to non-party Houlihan Lokey, Inc., (Filing No. 56 ), and motion to compel, (Filing No. 61 ), are granted in part, and denied in part as set forth in the court' s memorandum and order. 2) The parties are advised that the court has diligently attempted to memorialize the parties agreements and the courts orders as discussed during the hearing. If this order appears to deviate from those discussions and rulings, the parties shall review the recording, (Filing No. 90 ), for further clarification. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing
55
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 54 Joint Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In case no. 8:12cv386: a. Aurora Co-op's motion to dismiss (filing 54) is granted; b. Aventine Holdings' motion for summary judgment (filing 9) is denied as moot; c. Aurora Co-op's motion to supplement the r ecord (filing 56) is denied as moot; and d. The case is dismissed, and a separate judgment will be entered. In case no. 4:12cv230: a. The Aventine parties' motion to dismiss (also construed as a motion for summary judgment) (filing 25) is denied; and b. Aurora Co-op's motion to supplement the record (filing 34) is granted. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
|
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
43
ORDER: Within seven (7) days following the court's ruling on the pending dispositive motions, plaintiff's counsel shall contact Judge Zwart's chambers to schedule a conference call for discussing the case progression schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 6, 2012 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Mandatory disclosures ahll be served herein by December 12, 2012. A telephonic conference will be held on March 5, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss case progression and potential settlement. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
November 2, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER - Case No. 8:12cv386 Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc., v. Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company, is reassigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and to Magistrate judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Change Place of Trial to the Lincoln Division. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
|