Brown v. Earth Sound, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
John G. Brown |
Defendant: |
Earth Sound, Inc, James Kenny and Kenny Energy, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03001 |
Filed: |
January 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, ECF No. 49 , is granted, and Count III is dismissed with prejudice to the extent that the plaintiff's FLSA claim is based upon actions that occurred beyond the two-year statute of limitations. The plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, ECF No. 59 , is denied.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 52 Defendant's request for attorney fees and costs on it's motion to compel. The sum of $500.00 in attorney fees and costs is awarded to the defendants and against the plaintiff. The clerk shall enter this award as part of the judgment eventually entered in this case, unless at or before the time judgment is entered, the clerk is notified by the plaintiff that the award has been paid. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 64 Oral Motion to Continue Trial. In Chambers Conference set for 6/5/2013 08:30 AM before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Robert V. Denney Federal Building , 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2013 at 02:00 PM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 52 Defendant's Motion to Compel. 1) That portion of the defendants' motion, (Filing No. 52 ), which moves to compel production of documents is granted, and on or before February 21, 2013, Plainti ff shall fully respond to the Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. 2) That portion of the defendants' motion, (Filing No. 52 ), which requests an award of attorney fees and costs remains pending... Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
October 11, 2012 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 plaintiff's motion to transfer this case to the court's North Platte trial location. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?