Fleming v. Wolfe
Petitioner: Richard M. Fleming
Respondent: Michelle Wolfe
Case Number: 4:2012cv03036
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioners Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 16 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of thisMemorandum and Order. All other relief requested by Petitioner, including any and all relief sought pursuant to the "International Covenant on Civil and Political Rights" is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Clerk of the court is directed to reassign this matter from United States District Judge Warren Urbom to United States District Judge Richard Kopf. This matter remains assigned to the pro se docket; The Clerk of the court is directed to indicate on each docket sheet that case numbers 4:10CV3217 and 4:12CV3036 are related. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, Lincoln Division. The clerk of court shall transmit this order and this entire action to the USDC for the District of Nebraska, Lincoln Division, forthwith. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/24/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard M. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?