Biggs v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Biggs
Defendant: Mark Tosone, Blurred Entertainment, Inc, Michael Boyd, Colosseum Entertainment Corporation and Crowne Development, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv03037
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER extending discovery deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying defendant Michael Boyd's 54 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Stipulation. The jury trial before Judge Gerrard is reset for October 22, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska. The pretrial conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Zwart on October 8, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephonic conference with Magistrate Judge Zwart is set for February 12, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - The parties' joint motion (filing 61 ) is granted. The plaintiff's claims against Crowne Development, LLC, are dismissed with prejudice, complete record waived, with each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation. Amended progression order is as follows: Deposition deadline is 2/4/2013. Jury trial set for 7/16/2013 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2013 at 11:0 0 a.m. by WebEx. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating the pretrial conference by WebEx. The telephonic conference is set for 2/12/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Stipulation regarding modification of case preparation deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggs v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tosone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blurred Entertainment, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colosseum Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowne Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Biggs
Represented By: Ryan P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?