Franks v. Goodwill Industries of Greater Nebraska, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Franks
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater Nebraska, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03076
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT adopting 28 Stipulation for Dismissal. Plaintiff Pamela J. Franks' claims against Defendant Goodwill Industries of Greater Nebraska, Inc., are dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to pay their own fees and costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend. The discovery cutoff deadline is January 16, 2013 and deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is February 13, 2013. Pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. Telephone Conference set for 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion to Extend. The parties shall complete discovery by December 17, 2012 and the parties shall file any motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment by January 14, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. Goodwill Industries of Greater Nebraska, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Franks
Represented By: Erin M. Urbom
Represented By: David C. Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater Nebraska, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie C. Cooper
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?