Wells v. Lorenz Farm Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Ryan D. Wells |
Defendant: |
Dennis L. Lorenz and Lorenz Farm Service, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03085 |
Filed: |
April 30, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Gerrard |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Recovery/Enforcement |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
86
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order 79 . Plaintiff filed his itemized statement of fees on November 30, 2012. Accordingly, 1) The sum of $6,417.50 in attorney fees is awarded to the plaintiff and against the defendants.2) The clerk sha ll enter this award as part of the judgment eventually entered in this case, unless at or before the time judgment is entered, the clerk is notified by the plaintiff that the award has been paid. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1) The plaintiff's Objections, (Filing Nos. 67 and 69 ), to the defendants' notice of compliance, (Filing No. 66 ), are sustained.2) The plaintiff's motion for sanctions, (Filing No. 70 ), is granted as stated.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff Wells' 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants are liable to Wells for breach of contract, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, for an amount yet to be determined. Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
|
November 6, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER: Defendants' response to plaintiff's objections, (Filing Nos. 67 and 69), and to plaintiff's motion for sanctions, (Filing No. 70) shall be filed no later than November 13, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pending motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend time to file reply brief. The defendants' reply brief was considered in the court's ruling on the motion to change venue. ORDER denying 29 Motion to Change Venue. The court's order setting a conference call for September 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. remains in effect. The parties should be prepared to discuss further scheduling of this case to trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs motion to withdraw his motion to compel, (filing no. 39 ), is granted. Plaintiffs motion to compel, (filing no. 36 ), is withdrawn. Sanctions will be imposed against the defendants for any future unreasonable objections or delays in complying with discovery requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?