Iromuanya v. Houston
Petitioner: Lucky I. Iromuanya
Respondent: Robert P. Houston
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2012cv03091
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Iromuanya's petition for writ of habeas corpus and request for an evidentiary hearing are denied. A judgment in conformity with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska (or one of his assistants) is appointed to represent Petitioner. At this time, the appointment is limited to submitting briefs. The Clerk shall provide the Defender with a copy of this Memorandum and Order and the Defender or his assistant shall promptly enter an appearance. The following briefing schedule is established: Petitioner shall file a brief responding to Respondent's brief (see filing no. 22 ) and addressing any other pertinent matter on or before the close of business on May 24, 2013. Respondent shall file a reply brief on or before the close of business on June 7, 2013. The Motion for Additional Time and Second Motion for Reconsideration of Court Appointed Counsel (filing nos. 31 and 32) are granted as provided herein but otherwise denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and sent electronically to FPD)(GJG)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioners Motion to Extend and Motion to Reconsider Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 25 ) is granted in part and denied in part in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration of Court Appointed Counsel (filing no. 26 ) is denied. Petitioner's response brief is due no later than February 14, 2013. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in f ederal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By August 31, 2012, Respondent shall file a motion for summa ry judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 31, 2012: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 1, 2012: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discove ry shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 4 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(TCL )
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's application to proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted until August 6, 2012, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 6, 2012: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iromuanya v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert P. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucky I. Iromuanya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?