Woolman v. Lincoln Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Michael B. Woolman
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department and Lancaster County Attorney Office
Case Number: 4:2012cv03136
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. All other pending Motions are denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed iled to pro se party) (MKR)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2.) A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. All other pending motions are denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR, )
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before August 13, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notic e. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form A0240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 13, 2012: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy with forms mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolman v. Lincoln Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?